No. 19-8709
Title:Gregory Greer, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:June 15, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-12963)
   Decision Date:January 8, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 08 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due July 15, 2020)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixProof of Service
Jun 17 2020Waiver of right of respondent United States of America to respond filed.
Main Document
Jun 25 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/29/2020.
Aug 10 2020Response Requested. (Due September 9, 2020)
Aug 28 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from September 9, 2020 to October 9, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Aug 31 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including October 9, 2020.
Oct 09 2020Brief of respondent United States of America filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Dec 03 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/8/2021.
Dec 04 2020Rescheduled.
Dec 23 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/8/2021.
Jan 06 2021Reply of petitioner Gregory Greer filed. (Distributed)
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Jan 08 2021Motion to proceed in forma pauperis and petition for a writ of certiorari GRANTED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Meghan Collins
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Federal Public Defender
201 S. Orange Avenue
Suite 300
Orlando, FL 32801

Meghan_boyle@fd.org
407-648-6338
Party name: Gregory Greer
Attorneys for Respondent
Jeffrey B. Wall
    Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States of America