No. 19-8695 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:Ruben Gutierrez, Petitioner
v.
Luis V. Saenz, et al.
Docketed:June 15, 2020
Linked with 19A1052
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(20-70009)
   Decision Date:June 12, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 15 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due July 15, 2020)
PetitionMotion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisAppendixProof of ServiceOther
Jun 15 2020Application (19A1052) for a stay of execution of sentence of death, submitted to Justice Alito.
Main Document
Jun 15 2020Motion for leave to file amicus brief and motion for leave to file brief in compliance with Rule 33.2 filed by Texas Catholic Conference of Bishops.
Main DocumentOtherProof of Service
Jun 15 2020Brief of respondents Bryan Collier, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jun 16 2020Reply of petitioner Ruben Gutierrez filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jun 16 2020Application (19A1052) referred to the Court.
Jun 16 2020Application (19A1052) granted by the Court. The application for stay of execution of sentence of death presented to Justice Alito and by him referred to the Court is granted pending the disposition of the petition for a writ of certiorari. Should the petition for a writ of certiorari be denied, this stay shall terminate automatically. In the event the petition for a writ of certiorari is granted, the stay shall terminate upon the sending down of the judgment of this Court. The District Court should promptly determine, based on whatever evidence the parties provide, whether serious security problems would result if a prisoner facing execution is permitted to choose the spiritual adviser the prisoner wishes to have in his immediate presence during the execution.
Jun 25 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/29/2020.
Aug 10 2020Rescheduled.
Oct 05 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/9/2020.
Oct 05 2020Rescheduled.
Oct 13 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/16/2020.
Oct 13 2020Rescheduled.
Oct 26 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/30/2020.
Oct 26 2020Rescheduled.
Nov 02 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/6/2020.
Nov 02 2020Rescheduled.
Nov 09 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/13/2020.
Nov 10 2020Rescheduled.
Nov 16 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/20/2020.
Nov 17 2020Rescheduled.
Nov 30 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/4/2020.
Nov 30 2020Rescheduled.
Nov 30 2020Supplemental brief of petitioner Ruben Gutierrez filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 30 2020Motion for Leave to File District Court's Order of Ruben Gutierrez not accepted for filing. (December 09, 2020)
Dec 07 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/11/2020.
Dec 07 2020Rescheduled.
Dec 07 2020Supplemental brief of respondents Bryan Collier, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jan 04 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/8/2021.
Jan 11 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/15/2021.
Jan 19 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/22/2021.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Matthew C. Lawry
    Counsel of Record
Defender Assoc. of Phila.
Curtis Center, Suite 545 West
601 Walnut Street
Philadelphia, PA 19106

matthew_lawry@fd.org
215-928-0520
Party name: Ruben Gutierrez
Attorneys for Respondents
Jefferson David Clendenin
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General of Texas
P.O. Box 12548
Austin, TX 78711-2548

jay.clendenin@oag.texas.gov
5124631416
Party name: Bryan Collier, et al.