No. 19-868
Title:Aaron Miner, et al., Petitioners
v.
Steven L. Picatti
Docketed:January 14, 2020
Linked with 19A610
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Idaho
   Case Numbers:(45499)
   Decision Date:September 10, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Nov 22 2019Application (19A610) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from December 9, 2019 to January 8, 2020, submitted to Justice Kagan.
Main Document
Dec 02 2019Application (19A610) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until January 8, 2020.
Jan 08 2020Petition for Writ of Certiorari of Aaron Miner, et al. not accepted for filing. (January 10, 2020)
Jan 08 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 13, 2020)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word Count

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Erica Jeannine White
    Counsel of Record
Ada County Prosecuting Attorney's Office
200 W. Front Street Room 3191
Boise, ID 83702

ewhite@adacounty.id.gov
2082877700
Party name: Aaron Miner, et al.