No. 19-867
Title:Wexford Health, et al., Petitioners
v.
Kareem Garrett
Docketed:January 10, 2020
Linked with 19A552
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Third Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-3480)
   Decision Date:September 10, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Nov 18 2019Application (19A552) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from December 9, 2019 to February 7, 2020, submitted to Justice Alito.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Nov 18 2019Application (19A552) granted by Justice Alito extending the time to file until January 8, 2020.
Jan 08 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 10, 2020)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 14 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from February 10, 2020 to March 11, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jan 16 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including March 11, 2020.
Feb 07 2020Brief amici curiae of Texas Association of Counties, National Sheriffs' Association, and Western States Sheriffs' Association filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Feb 10 2020Brief of respondent Debra Younkin, et al. in support filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 11 2020Brief of respondent Kareem Garrett in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 20 2020Reply of petitioners Shella A. Khatri, M.D., et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 25 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/17/2020.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Michael James Bentley
    Counsel of Record
Bradley Arant Boult Cummings LLP
188 East Capitol Street, Suite 1000
Jackson, MS 39201

mbentley@bradley.com
6015929935
Party name: Shella A. Khatri, M.D., et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Sean Andrew Kirkpatrick
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General of the Commonwealth of Pennsylvania
Strawberry Square
15th Floor
Harrisburg, PA 17120

skirkpatrick@attorneygeneral.gov
717-705-2331
Party name: Debra Younkin, et al.
Michael Hugh McGinley
    Counsel of Record
Dechert LLP
1900 K Street, NW
Washington, DC 20006

michael.mcginley@dechert.com
202-261-3300
Party name: Kareem Garrett
Other
Gregory Todd Butler
    Counsel of Record
Phelps Dunbar LLP
4270 I-55 North
Jackson, MS 39211

Todd.Butler@phelps.com
601-352-2300
Party name: Texas Association of Counties, National Sheriffs' Association, and Western States Sheriffs' Association