No. 19-864
Title:Bradley Beers, Petitioner
v.
William P. Barr, Attorney General, et al.
Docketed:January 10, 2020
Linked with 19A582
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Third Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-3010)
   Decision Date:June 20, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:September 11, 2019
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Nov 20 2019Application (19A582) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from December 10, 2019 to February 8, 2020, submitted to Justice Alito.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Nov 25 2019Application (19A582) granted by Justice Alito extending the time to file until January 9, 2020.
Jan 09 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 10, 2020)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 04 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from February 10, 2020 to March 11, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Feb 05 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including March 11, 2020.
Mar 05 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 11, 2020 to April 10, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Mar 06 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including April 10, 2020.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Jeffrey T. Green
    Counsel of Record
Sidley Austin
1501 K Street, NW
Washington, DC 20005

jgreen@sidley.com
202 736 8291
Party name: Bradley Beers
Attorneys for Respondents
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Barr, William, et al.