No. 19-863
Title:Agusto Niz-Chavez, Petitioner
v.
William P. Barr, Attorney General
Docketed:January 9, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-4264)
   Decision Date:October 24, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jan 09 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 10, 2020)
Main Document
Jan 09 2020Pursuant to Rule 34.6 and Paragraph 9 of the Guidelines for the Submission of Documents to the Supreme Court's Electronic Filing System, filings in ths case should be submitted in paper form only, and should not be submitted through the Court's electronic filing systesm.
Feb 05 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from February 10, 2020 to March 11, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Feb 05 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including March 11, 2020.
Mar 05 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 11, 2020 to April 10, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Mar 06 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including April 10, 2020.
Apr 10 2020Brief of respondent William P. Barr, Attorney General in opposition filed.
Main Document
Apr 20 2020Motion of petitioner to delay distribution of the petition for a writ of certiorari under Rule 15.5 from April 28, 2020 to May 12, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Apr 21 2020Motion to delay distribution of the petition for a writ of certiorari until May 12, 2020, granted.
May 01 2020Letter of May 1, 2020 from the Solicitor General filed.
Main Document
May 11 2020Reply of petitioner Agusto Niz-Chavez filed.
Main Document
May 12 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/28/2020.
May 20 2020Letter of May 20, 2020 from counsel for petitioner filed.
Main Document
Jun 01 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/4/2020.
Jun 08 2020Petition GRANTED.
Jun 08 2020As Rule 34.6 provides, “If the Court schedules briefing and oral argument in a case that was governed by Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 5.2(c) or Federal Rule of Criminal Procedure 49.1(c), the parties shall submit electronic versions of all prior and subsequent filings with this Court in the case, subject to [applicable] redaction rules.” Subsequent party and amicus filings in the case should now be submitted through the Court’s electronic filing system, with any necessary redactions.
Jul 13 2020Motion for an extension of time to file the briefs on the merits filed.
Main Document
Jul 20 2020Motion to extend the time to file the briefs on the merits granted. The time to file the joint appendix and petitioner's brief on the merits is extended to and including August 6, 2020. The time to file respondent's brief on the merits is extended to and including September 21, 2020.
Aug 06 2020Joint appendix filed. (Statement of costs filed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceOther
Aug 06 2020Brief of petitioner Agusto Niz-Chavez filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 13 2020Brief amici curiae of Thirty-Three Former Immigration Judges and Members of the Board of Immigration Appeals filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 13 2020Brief amicus curiae of National Immigrant Justice Center filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 13 2020Brief amici curiae of American Immigration Lawyers Association, The American Immigration Council, Legal Services Providers filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Aug 19 2020SET FOR ARGUMENT on Monday, November 9, 2020.
Aug 31 2020Record requested from the U.S.C.A. 6th Circuit.
Sep 02 2020CIRCULATED
Sep 16 2020Motion for an extension of time to file respondent's brief on the merits filed.
Main Document
Sep 18 2020Motion to extend the time to file respondent's brief on the merits granted and the time is extended to and including September 25, 2020.
Sep 25 2020Brief of respondent William P. Barr, Attorney General filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
David Jacob Zimmer
    Counsel of Record
Goodwin Procter LLP
100 Northern Ave.
Boston, MA 02210

dzimmer@goodwinlaw.com
6175701000
Party name: Agusto Niz-Chavez
Attorneys for Respondent
Jeffrey B. Wall
    Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Barr, Att'y Gen.
Other
Holly Lee Henderson-Fisher
    Counsel of Record
Skadden, Arps, Slate, Meagher & Flom LLP
One Manhattan West
New York, NY 10001-8602

holly.henderson@skadden.com
212-735-3073
Party name: American Immigration Lawyers Association, The American Immigration Council, Legal Services Providers
Richard W. Mark
    Counsel of Record
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
200 Park Avenue
New York, NY 10166

RMark@gibsondunn.com
(212) 351-3818
Party name: Thirty-Three Former Immigration Judges and Members of the Board of Immigration Appeals
Zachary Charles Schauf
    Counsel of Record
Jenner & Block, LLP
1099 New York Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20001

ZSchauf@jenner.com
202-637-6379
Party name: National Immigrant Justice Center