No. 19-859
Title:Stuart Force, et al., Petitioner
v.
Facebook, Inc.
Docketed:January 9, 2020
Linked with 19A499
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-397)
   Decision Date:July 31, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:August 29, 2019
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Nov 06 2019Application (19A499) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from November 27, 2019 to January 11, 2020, submitted to Justice Ginsburg.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Nov 14 2019Application (19A499) granted by Justice Ginsburg extending the time to file until January 13, 2020.
Jan 02 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 10, 2020)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 24 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from February 10, 2020 to March 26, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jan 24 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including March 26, 2020.
Mar 24 2020Brief of respondent Facebook, Inc. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Eric Schnapper
    Counsel of Record
Univ. of Washington School of Law
P.O. Box 353020
Seattle, WA 98195

schnapp@uw.edu
206-616-3167
Party name: Stuart Force, et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Craig S Primis
    Counsel of Record
Kirkland & Ellis, LLP
1301 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20004

cprimis@kirkland.com
202-389-5921
Party name: Facebook, Inc.