No. 19-857
Title:GPI Distributors, Inc., Petitioner
v.
Northeast Ohio Regional Sewer District
Docketed:January 9, 2020
Linked with 19A456
Lower Ct:Court of Appeals of Ohio, Cuyahoga County
   Case Numbers:(106806)
   Decision Date:December 6, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:May 29, 2019

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 23 2019Application (19A456) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from November 4, 2019 to January 3, 2020, submitted to Justice Sotomayor.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/Opinions
Oct 28 2019Application (19A456) granted by Justice Sotomayor extending the time to file until January 3, 2020.
Jan 03 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 10, 2020)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 13 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from February 10, 2020 to March 11, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jan 15 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including March 11, 2020.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Andrew Stuart Pollis
    Counsel of Record
Milton A. Kramer Law Clinic Center
Case Western Reserve University School of Law
11075 East Boulevard
Cleveland, OH 44106

andrew.pollis@case.edu
2163682766
Party name: GPI Distributors, Inc.
Attorneys for Respondent
Jennifer Dowdell Armstrong
    Counsel of Record
McDonald Hopkins, LLC
600 Superior Avenue, East, Suite 2100
Cleveland, OH 44114

jarmstrong@mcdonaldhopkins.com
216-348-5400
Party name: Northeast Ohio Regional Sewer District