No. 19-849
Title:Kristanalea Dyroff, Individually and on Behalf of the Estate of Wesley Greer, Petitioner
v.
Ultimate Software Group, Inc.
Docketed:January 6, 2020
Linked with 19A525
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-15175)
   Decision Date:August 20, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Nov 06 2019Application (19A525) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from November 18, 2019 to January 2, 2020, submitted to Justice Kagan.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Nov 12 2019Application (19A525) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until January 2, 2020.
Jan 02 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 5, 2020)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 24 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from February 5, 2020 to March 23, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jan 28 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including March 23, 2020.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Eric Schnapper
    Counsel of Record
Univ. of Washington School of Law
P.O. Box 353020
Seattle, WA 98195

schnapp@uw.edu
206-616-3167
Party name: Kristanalea Dyroff
Attorneys for Respondent
Jeffry Albin Miller
    Counsel of Record
Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith
701 B Street, Suite 1900
San Diego, CA 92101

jeff.miller@lewisbrisbois.com
619-699-4971
Party name: The Ultimate Software Group, et al.