No. 19-847
Title:Jonathan Reisman, Petitioner
v.
Associated Faculties of the University of Maine, et al.
Docketed:January 6, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the First Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-2201)
   Decision Date:October 4, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jan 02 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 5, 2020)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 24 2020Brief amicus curiae of Pacific Legal Foundation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 30 2020Waiver of right of respondent Associated Faculties of the University of Maine to respond filed.
Main Document
Jan 31 2020Waiver of right of respondents University of Maine at Machias, the Board of Trustees of the University of Maine System to respond filed.
Main Document
Jan 31 2020Waiver of right of respondent State of Maine to respond filed.
Main Document
Feb 04 2020Brief amicus curiae of National Right to Work Legal Defense Foundation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 04 2020Brief amicus curiae of Competitive Enterprise Institute filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Feb 05 2020Brief amicus curiae of The Fairness Center filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Feb 05 2020Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by Freedom Foundation.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 05 2020Brief amicus curiae of Liberty Justice Center filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Feb 05 2020Brief amicus curiae of Goldwater Institute filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Feb 05 2020Brief amicus curiae of National Association of Scholars filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Feb 05 2020Brief amici curiae of Public Policy Research Organizations and Advocacy Groups filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Feb 05 2020Brief amicus curiae of The Cato Institute filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 19 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/6/2020.
Feb 27 2020Response Requested. (Due March 30, 2020)
Mar 05 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 30, 2020 to April 30, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Mar 09 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including April 30, 2020, for all respondents.
Mar 30 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 30, 2020 to June 30, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Apr 01 2020Letter of respondent Maine received.
Main Document
Apr 01 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including June 30, 2020, for all respondents.
Jun 25 2020Brief of respondent University of Maine at Machias, the Board of Trustees of the University of Maine System in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jun 26 2020Brief of respondent State of Maine in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 29 2020Brief of respondent Associated Faculties of the University of Maine in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jul 13 2020Reply of petitioner Jonathan Reisman filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jul 15 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/29/2020.
Sep 02 2020Supplemental brief of petitioner Jonathan Reisman filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 08 2020Supplemental brief of respondent Associated Faculties of the University of Maine filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Andrew Michael Grossman
    Counsel of Record
Baker & Hostetler LLP
1050 Connecticut Avenue, N.W.
Suite 1100
Washington, DC 20036

agrossman@bakerlaw.com
2028611697
Party name: Jonathan Reisman
Attorneys for Respondents
Susan P. Herman
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General
6 State House Station
Augusta, ME 04333

susan.herman@maine.gov
207 626 8814
Party name: State of Maine
Jacob Raffel Karabell
    Counsel of Record
Bredhoff & Kaiser, P.L.L.C.
805 15th Street, N.W. Suite 1000
Washington, DC 20005

jkarabell@bredhoff.com
2028422600
Party name: Associated Faculties of the University of Maine
Linda Dufty McGill
    Counsel of Record
Bernstein, Shur, Sawyer and Nelson, PA
100 Middle Street
PO Box 9729
Portland, ME 04104-5029

lmcgill@bernsteinshur.com
2072287226
Party name: University of Maine at Machias, the Board of Trustees of the University of Maine System
Other
James Gideon Abernathy
    Counsel of Record
Freedom Foundation
PO Box 552
Olympia, WA 98507

JamesGAbernathy@gmail.com
5133127758
Party name: Freedom Foundation
George Edward Anhang
    Counsel of Record
Shearman & Sterling LLP
401 9th Street, NW
Suite 800
Washington, DC 20004-2128

george.anhang@Shearman.com
202 508 8044
Party name: National Association of Scholars
Jacob H. Huebert
    Counsel of Record
Goldwater institute
500 E. Coronado Rd.
Phoenix, AZ 85004

jhuebert@goldwaterinstitute.org
6024625000
Party name: Goldwater Institute
Erik S. Jaffe
    Counsel of Record
Schaerr | Jaffe LLP
1717 K Street, N.W., Suite 900
Washington, DC 20006

ejaffe@schaerr-jaffe.com
202-415-7412
Party name: Public Policy Research Organizations and Advocacy Groups
Sam Kazman
    Counsel of Record
1310 L Street, N.W.
7th Floor
Washington, DC 20005

sam.kazman@cei.org
202-331-2265
Party name: Competitive Enterprise Institute
Nathan John McGrath
    Counsel of Record
The Fairness Center
500 North Third Street
Floor 2
Harrisburg, PA 17101

nathan@fairnesscenter.org
844.293.1001
Party name: The Fairness Center
William L. Messenger
    Counsel of Record
c/o National Right to Work Legal Defense Foundation, Inc.
8001 Braddock Road, Suite 600
Springfield, VA 22160

wlm@nrtw.org
7033218510
Party name: National Right to Work Legal Defense Foundation
Ilya Shapiro
    Counsel of Record
Cato Institute
1000 Massachusetts Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20001

ishapiro@cato.org
2028420200
Party name: The Cato Institute
Daniel Robert Suhr
    Counsel of Record
Liberty Justice Center
190 S. LaSalle St., Suire 1500
Chicago, IL 60603

dsuhr@libertyjusticecenter.org
4145881658
Party name: Liberty Justice Center
Erin Elizabeth Wilcox
    Counsel of Record
Pacific Legal Foundation
930 G Street
Sacramento, CA 95814

ewilcox@pacificlegal.org
(916) 419-7111
Party name: Pacific Legal Foundation