No. 19-840
Vide 19-1019
Title:California, et al., Petitioners
v.
Texas, et al.
Docketed:January 3, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-10011)
   Decision Date:December 18, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jan 03 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 3, 2020)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 03 2020Motion to expedite consideration of the petition for a writ of certiorari filed by petitioners.
Main Document
Jan 06 2020Response to motion requested. (Due January 10, 2020, by 4 p.m.)
Jan 10 2020Blanket Consent filed by Respondent, U.S. House of Representatives.
Blanket Consent
Jan 10 2020Response to motion from Federal respondents filed.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Jan 10 2020Response to motion from State respondents filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jan 10 2020Response to motion from respondent Neill Hurley and John Nantz submitted.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceOther
Jan 13 2020Reply in support of motion filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jan 15 2020Brief amicus curiae of America's Health Insurance Plans filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 15 2020Brief amici curiae of National Hospital Associations filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 15 2020Brief amici curiae of American Cancer Society et al. filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 15 2020Motion for leave to file amici brief filed by 33 State Hospital Associations.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jan 15 2020Brief amicus curiae of Small Business Majority Foundation filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 15 2020Brief amici curiae of AARP, et al. filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 15 2020Brief amicus curiae of Bipartisan Economic Scholars filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 16 2020Brief amici curiae of Alliance of Community Health Plans and Association for Community Affiliated Plans filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 17 2020Brief amicus curiae of Jeremy C. Doerre filed. VIDED
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 21 2020Motion to expedite consideration filed by petitioner DENIED.
Jan 21 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from February 3, 2020 to March 17, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jan 22 2020Response to motion from respondent U.S. House of Representatives filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jan 22 2020Response to motion from petitioners California, et al. filed.
Main Document
Jan 24 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response to the petition for a writ of certiorari is denied.
Jan 31 2020Waiver of right of respondent U.S. House of Representatives to respond filed.
Main Document
Jan 31 2020Letter waiving the 14-day waiting period for the distribution of the petition for a writ of certiorari pursuant to Rule 15.5 filed.
Main Document
Feb 03 2020Brief of State of Texas, et al. in opposition not accepted for filing. (February 03, 2020 -- Corrected version to be submitted)
Feb 03 2020Brief amicus curiae of Association of American Physicians and Surgeons filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Feb 03 2020Brief of respondents United States, et al. in opposition filed. VIDED
Main DocumentCertificate of Word Count
Feb 03 2020Brief of respondents State of Texas, et al. in opposition filed. VIDED. (February 3, 2020)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 03 2020Brief of respondents Neill Hurley and John Nantz in opposition filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 05 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/21/2020.
Feb 12 2020Reply of petitioners California, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Feb 18 2020Letter of February 18, 2020 from counsel for respondent U.S. House of Representatives filed. (Distributed)
Main Document
Feb 19 2020Letter of February 19, 2020 from counsel for petitioner filed. (Distributed)
Main Document
Feb 24 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/28/2020.
Mar 02 2020Motion for leave to file amici brief filed by 33 State Hospital Associations GRANTED.
Mar 02 2020Petition GRANTED. The petition for a writ of certiorari in No. 19-1019 is granted. The cases are consolidated and a total of one hour is allotted for oral argument. VIDED.
Mar 02 2020Because the Court has consolidated these cases for briefing and oral argument, future filings and activity in the cases will now be reflected on the docket of No. 19-840. Subsequent filings in these cases must therefore be submitted through the electronic filing system in No. 19-840. Each document submitted in connection with one or more of these cases must include on its cover the case number and caption for each case in which the filing is intended to be submitted. Where a filing is submitted in fewer than all of the cases, the docket entry will reflect the case number(s) in which the filing is submitted; a document filed in all of the consolidated cases will be noted as “VIDED.”
Mar 19 2020Blanket Consent filed by federal respondents United States, et al. VIDED.
Blanket Consent
Mar 20 2020Blanket Consent filed by State of Texas, et al. VIDED.
Blanket Consent
Mar 20 2020Blanket Consent filed by U.S. House of Representatives. VIDED.
Blanket Consent
Mar 20 2020Motion for an extension of time to file the briefs on the merits. VIDED.
Main Document
Apr 02 2020Motion to extend the time to file the briefs on the merits granted. Petitioners in No. 19-840 and the U.S. House of Representatives have to and including May 6, 2020, within which to file a joint appendix and opening briefs on the merits limited to the questions presented in No. 19-840. Petitioners in No. 19-1019 and the federal respondents in No. 19-840 have to and including June 25, 2020, within which to file consolidated opening briefs on the questions presented in both cases. Petitioners in No. 19-840 and the U.S. House of Representatives have to and including July 29, 2020, within which to file consolidated opening and reply briefs on the questions presented in both cases. Petitioners in No. 19-1019 have to and including August 18, 2020, within which to file a reply brief limited to Question 2 presented by the petition for certiorari in No. 19-1019. VIDED.
Apr 02 2020Amicus curiae briefs in support of petitioners in No. 19-840, the U.S. House of Representatives, or in support of neither party, on the questions presented in either case are to be filed on or before May 13, 2020. Amicus curiae briefs in support of petitioners in No. 19-1019 or the federal respondents in No. 19-840 on the questions presented in either case are to be filed on or before July 2, 2020. An amicus curiae shall file only a single brief in these cases. VIDED.
Apr 30 2020Brief amicus curiae of David Boyle filed. (in 19-840)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 06 2020Brief of respondent U.S. House of Representatives filed.(in 19-840)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 06 2020Joint appendix filed. (Statement of cost filed.) VIDED.
Main DocumentProof of Service
May 06 2020Brief of petitioners California, et al. filed.(in 19-840)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
May 12 2020Brief amicus curiae of Small Business Majority Foundation filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 12 2020Brief amicus curiae of Jeremy C. Doerre filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 12 2020Brief amicus curiae of Public Citizen, Inc. filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 13 2020Amicus brief of Washington and Lee University School of Law Black Lung Clinic not accepted for filing. (May 14, 2020 - Corrected PDF to be submitted.)
May 13 2020Brief amicus curiae of Washington and Lee University School of Law Black Lung Clinic filed (in 19-840).
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 13 2020Brief amici curiae of Professors Michael C. Dorf and Martin S. Lederman filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 13 2020Brief amici curiae of Bipartisan Economic Scholars filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 13 2020Brief amici curiae of American Cancer Society et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 13 2020Brief amici curiae of National Women's Law Center, et al. filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 13 2020Brief amici curiae of Service Employees International Union, et al. filed. VIDED.
Certificate of Word CountProof of ServiceMain Document
May 13 2020Brief amicus curiae of HCA Healthcare, Inc. filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 13 2020Brief amici curiae of Tribes and Tribal Organizations filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 13 2020Brief amici curiae of Health Care Policy Scholars filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 13 2020Brief amici curiae of Alliance of Community Health Plans and Association for Community Affiliated Plans filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 13 2020Brief amici curiae of Public Health Experts, et al. filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 13 2020Brief amici curiae of National Hospital Associations filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 13 2020Brief amicus curiae of Patient-Centered Outcomes Research Institute filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 13 2020Brief amici curiae of 44 Counties, Cities, and Towns and California State Association of Counties filed. (in 19-840)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 13 2020Brief amici curiae of First Focus on Children and The Children's Partnership filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 13 2020Brief amicus curiae of The National Association of Community Health Centers filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 13 2020Brief amicus curiae of America's Health Insurance Plans filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 13 2020Brief amici curiae of 47 Members of the United States Senate filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 13 2020Brief amici curiae of Walter Dellinger, Douglas Laycock, Christopher Schroeder filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
May 13 2020Brief amici curiae of Lambda Legal Defense and Education Fund, Inc., et al. filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
May 13 2020Brief amici curiae of States of Ohio and Montana in support of neither party filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 13 2020Brief amici curiae of American Medical Association, et al. filed. (in 19-840)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 13 2020Brief amici curiae of Samuel L. Bray, Michael W. McConnell, and Kevin C. Walsh filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 13 2020Brief amici curiae of National Health Law Program, et al. filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 13 2020Brief amici curiae of AARP, et al. filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 13 2020Brief amicus curiae of Association for Accessible Medicines filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 13 2020Brief amici curiae of Families USA, et al. filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
May 13 2020Brief amici curiae of Professors Jonathan H. Adler, et al. filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 13 2020Brief amici curiae of States of Maryland, et al. filed (in 19-840).
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 13 2020Brief amicus curiae of The Catholic Health Association of the United States filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
May 13 2020Brief amici curiae of 36 State Hospital Associations filed (in 19-840).
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
May 13 2020Brief amicus curiae of Blue Cross Blue Shield Association filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 13 2020Brief amici curiae of American Association of People with Disabilities, et. al. filed. VIDED.
Certificate of Word CountProof of ServiceMain Document
May 13 2020Brief amicus curiae of American Thoracic Society filed.(in 19-840)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of ServiceOther
Jun 25 2020Brief of respondents State of Texas, et al. filed. VIDED
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 25 2020Brief of respondents Neill Hurley and John Nantz filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 25 2020Brief amicus curiae of Foundation for Moral Law filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jun 25 2020Brief of Federal Respondents filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jun 30 2020Motion to Participate in Oral Argument and for Expanded Argument of States of Ohio and Montana submitted.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jul 02 2020Amicus brief of American Center for Law and Justice submitted.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 02 2020Amicus brief of Association of American Physicians and Surgeons submitted.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Samuel Passchier Siegel
    Counsel of Record
California Department of Justice
1300 I Street
Sacramento, CA 95814

sam.siegel@doj.ca.gov
(916) 210-6269
Party name: California, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States, et al.
Kyle Douglas Hawkins
    Counsel of Record
Texas Attorney General's Office
P.O. Box 12548 (MC 059)
Austin, TX 78711-2548

kyle.hawkins@oag.texas.gov
5129361700
Party name: State of Texas, et al.
Robert Earl Henneke
    Counsel of Record
Texas Public Policy Foundation
901 Congress Avenue
Austin, TX 78701

rhenneke@texaspolicy.com
512-472-2700
Party name: Neill Hurley and John Nantz
Douglas Neal Letter
    Counsel of Record
219 Cannon House Office Building
Washington, DC 20515-6532

douglas.letter@mail.house.gov
202-225-9700
Party name: U.S. House of Representatives in support of petitioners
Other
Hope Madeline Babcock
    Counsel of Record
Georgetown University Law Ctr.
600 New Jersey Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20001

babcock@law.georgetown.edu
2026629535
Party name: American Thoracic Society
Nicole G. Berner
    Counsel of Record
Service Employees International Union
1800 Massachusetts Avenue NW
Washington, DC 20036

nicole.berner@seiu.org
2027307000
Party name: Service Employees International Union, et al.
K. Lee Blalack II
    Counsel of Record
O'Melveny & Myers, LLP
1625 Eye Street, NW
Washington, DC 20006

lblalack@omm.com
202-383-5374
Party name: Blue Cross Blue Shield Association
David Christopher Boyle
    Counsel of Record
PO Box 15143
Long Beach, CA 90815

dbo@boyleslaw.org
(734)-904-6132
Party name: David Boyle
Stuart Frank Delery
    Counsel of Record
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
1050 Connecticut Ave. NW
Washington, DC 20036

SDelery@gibsondunn.com
(202) 887-3650
Party name: First Focus on Children and The Children's Partnership
John Allen Eidsmoe
    Counsel of Record
Foundation for Moral Law
One Dexter Avenue
Montgomery, AL 36064

eidsmoeja@juno.com
3343241812
Party name: Foundation for Moral Law
Brian Halligan Fletcher
    Counsel of Record
Stanford Law School Supreme Court Litigation Clinic
559 Nathan Abbott Way
Stanford, CA 94305

bfletcher@law.stanford.edu
650-724-3345
Party name: Health Care Policy Scholars
Benjamin Michael Flowers
    Counsel of Record
Ohio Attorney General Dave Yost
30 E. Broad St.
Columbus, OH 43215

benjamin.flowers@ohioattorneygeneral.gov
6144668980
Party name: States of Ohio and Montana
Caitlin Joan Halligan
    Counsel of Record
Selendy & Gay PLLC
1290 Avenue of the Americas
New York, NY 10104

challigan@selendygay.com
(212) 390-9000
Party name: Walter Dellinger, Douglas Laycock, Christopher Schroeder
William McGinley Jay
    Counsel of Record
Goodwin Procter, LLP
1900 N Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20036

WJay@goodwinlaw.com
2023464190
Party name: Association for Accessible Medicines
Mark P. Johnson
    Counsel of Record
Dentons US LLP
4520 Main Street
Suite 1100
Kansas City, MO 64113

mark.johnson@dentons.com
8164565044
Party name: American Association of People with Disabilities, et. al.
Allon Kedem
    Counsel of Record
Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer LLP
601 Massachusetts Avenue NW
Washington, DC 20001

allon.kedem@arnoldporter.com
2029426234
Party name: Families USA et al.
Rakesh Nageswar Kilaru
    Counsel of Record
Wilkinson Walsh LLP
2001 M Street NW
10th Floor
Washington, DC 20036

rkilaru@wilkinsonwalsh.com
2028474046
Party name: Professors Michael C. Dorf and Martin S. Lederman
Michael B. Kimberly
    Counsel of Record
MCDERMOTT WILL & EMERY
500 North Capitol Street, NW
The McDermott Building
Washington, DC 20001

mkimberly@mwe.com
(202) 756-8901
Party name: Public Health Experts, The American Public Health Association, and The American Academy Of Nursing
John Louis Longstreth
    Counsel of Record
K&L Gates LLP
1601 K Street NW
Washington, DC 20006

john.longstreth@klgates.com
2027789000
Party name: American Cancer Society et al.
Timothy C. MacDonnell
    Counsel of Record
Washington and Lee School of Law Black Lung Clinic
Room 106, Sydney Lewis Hall, East Denny Circle
Washington and Lee School of Law
Lexington, VA 24450

macdonnellt@wlu.edu
540-458-8224
Party name: Washington and Lee University School of Law Black Lung Clinic
Kirsten V. Mayer
    Counsel of Record
Ropes and Gray LLP
800 Boylston Street
Boston, MA 02199-3600

kirsten.mayer@ropesgray.com
617-951-7753
Party name: Lambda Legal Defense and Education Fund, Inc. et al.
Raffi Melkonian
    Counsel of Record
Wright, Close & Barger LLP
1 Riverway, Suite 2200
Houston, TX 77056

melkonian@wrightclose.com
713-572-4321
Party name: Samuel L. Bray, Michael W. McConnell, and Kevin C. Walsh
Stephen William Miller
    Counsel of Record
Harris, Wiltshire & Grannis LLP
1919 M Street NW, Eighth Floor
Washington, DC 20036

smiller@hwglaw.com
2027301305
Party name: The Catholic Health Association of the United States
Leonard A. Nelson
    Counsel of Record
American Medical Association
330 N. Wabash Avenue
Suite 39300
Chicago, IL 60611

leonard.nelson@ama-assn.org
3124645532
Party name: American Medical Association, et al.
Scott Lawrence Nelson
    Counsel of Record
Public Citizen Litigation Group
1600 20th Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20009

snelson@citizen.org
202-588-1000
Party name: Public Citizen, Inc.
Joseph Russell Palmore
    Counsel of Record
Morrison & Foerster LLP
2000 Pennsylvania Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20006

jpalmore@mofo.com
202-887-6940
Party name: Professors Jonathan H. Adler, Nicholas Bagley, Abbe R. Gluck, and Ilya Somin
Jane Perkins
    Counsel of Record
National Health Law Program
200 North Greensboro Street
Suite D-13
Carrboro, NC 27510

perkins@healthlaw.org
919 968 6308
Party name: National Health Law Program, et al.
Elizabeth Barchas Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Cooley LLP
1299 Pennsylvania Ave, NW
Washington, DC 20004

eprelogar@cooley.com
(202) 842-7800
Party name: 47 Members of the United States Senate
Jaime Ann Santos
    Counsel of Record
Goodwin Procter LLP
1900 N St. NW
Washington, DC 20036

jsantos@goodwinlaw.com
2023464034
Party name: National Women's Law Center, National Partnership for Women & Families, Black Women's Health Imperative, American Medical Women's Association, and 77 Additional Organizations
William Barnett Schultz
    Counsel of Record
Zuckerman Spaeder LLP
1800 M Street NW, Suite 1000
Washington, DC 20036-5802

wschultz@zuckerman.com
202-778-1800
Party name: 36 State Hospital Associations
Virginia Anne Seitz
    Counsel of Record
Sidley Austin LLP
1501 K Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20005

vseitz@sidley.com
202-736-8000
Party name: Patient-Centered Outcomes Research Institute
Jay Alan Sekulow
    Counsel of Record
American Center for Law and Justice
American Center for Law and Justice
201 Maryland Avenue, N.E.
Washington, DC 20002

sekulow@aclj.org
2022485407
Party name: American Center for Law and Justice
Geoffrey D. Strommer
    Counsel of Record
Hobbs, Straus, Dean & Walker, LLP
215 SW Washington Street
Suite 200
Portland, OR 97204

gstrommer@hobbsstraus.com
503242174
Party name: Tribes and Tribal Organizations
Steven Marshall Sullivan
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General of Maryland
200 St. Paul Place, 20th Floor
Baltimore, MD 21202

ssullivan@oag.state.md.us
4105766427
Party name: States of Maryland, Maine, New Hampshire, New Mexico, Pennsylvania and Wisconsin
Lorraine Alofa Van Kirk
    Counsel of Record
Office of the County Counsel, County of Santa Clara
70 West Hedding Street, East Wing, 9th Floor
San Jose, CA 95110

lorraine.van_kirk@cco.sccgov.org
4082995944
Party name: 44 Counties, Cities, and Towns and California State Association of Counties
Edward Todd Waters
    Counsel of Record
Feldesman Tucker Leifer Fidell LLP
1129 20th Street, NW, Suite 400
Washington, DC 20036

ewaters@feldesmantucker.com
2026003570
Party name: The National Association of Community Health Centers
David Meir Zionts
    Counsel of Record
Covington & Burlington LLP
850 Tenth Street, NW
Washington, DC 20001

dzionts@cov.com
202-662-6000
Party name: HCA Healthcare, Inc.
Allen Xavier Baker
    Counsel of Record
Crowell & Moring LLP
1001 Pennsylvania Ave., N.W.
Washington, DC 20004

xbaker@crowell.com
202-624-2842
Party name: Alliance of Community Health Plans and Association for Community Affiliated Plans
Jeremy Cooper Doerre
    Counsel of Record
Tillman Wright, PLLC
3440 Toringdon Way, Suite 310
Charlotte, NC 28277

jdoerre@ti-law.com
7042484883
Party name: Jeremy C. Doerre
Maame Gyamfi
    Counsel of Record
AARP Foundation Litigation
601 E Street NW
Washington, DC 20049

mgyamfi@aarp.org
202-434-6291
Party name: AARP, et al.
Matthew S. Hellman
    Counsel of Record
Jenner & Block LLP
1099 New York Ave., NW
Suite 900
Washington, DC 20001

mhellman@jenner.com
202-639-6000
Party name: Bipartisan Economic Scholars
Hyland Hunt
    Counsel of Record
Deutsch Hunt PLLC
300 New Jersey Ave. NW
Suite 900
Washington, DC 20001

hhunt@deutschhunt.com
2028686915
Party name: Small Business Majority Foundation
Sean Marotta
    Counsel of Record
Hogan Lovells US LLP
555 Thirteenth Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20004

sean.marotta@hoganlovells.com
2026374881
Party name: National Hospital Associations
Andrew L. Schlafly
    Counsel of Record
939 Old Chester Road
Far Hills, NJ 07931

aschlafly@aol.com
908-719-8608
Party name: Association of American Physicians and Surgeons
William Barnett Schultz
    Counsel of Record
Zuckerman Spaeder LLP
1800 M Street NW, Suite 1000
Washington, DC 20036-5802

wschultz@zuckerman.com
202-778-1800
Party name: 33 State Hospital Associations
Pratik Arvind Shah
    Counsel of Record
Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld, LLP
2001 K Street N.W.
Washington, DC 20006

pshah@akingump.com
202-887-4210
Party name: America's Health Insurance Plans