No. 19-839
Title:Eastern Oregon Mining Association, et al., Petitioners
v.
Oregon Department of Environmental Quality, et al.
Docketed:January 3, 2020
Linked with 19A262
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Oregon
   Case Numbers:(CC 10C24263)
   Decision Date:July 25, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Sep 03 2019Application (19A262) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from October 23, 2019 to December 22, 2019, submitted to Justice Kagan.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Sep 05 2019Application (19A262) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until December 22, 2019.
Dec 20 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 3, 2020)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 10 2020Waiver of right of respondents Oregon Department of Environmental Quality, et al. to respond filed.
Main Document
Feb 03 2020Amicus brief of American Mining Rights Association, et al. not accepted for filing. (February 04, 2020)
Feb 03 2020Brief amici curiae of American Mining Rights Association, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Feb 05 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/21/2020.
Feb 07 2020Response Requested. (Due March 9, 2020)
Feb 13 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 9, 2020 to April 8, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Feb 18 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including April 8, 2020.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Damien Michael Schiff
    Counsel of Record
Pacific Legal Foundation
930 G Street
Sacramento, CA 95814

dschiff@pacificlegal.org
(916) 419-7111
Party name: Thomas A. Kitchar, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Benjamin Noah Gutman
    Counsel of Record
Oregon Department of Justice
1162 Court Street NE
Salem, OR 97301

benjamin.gutman@doj.state.or.us
503-378-4402
Party name: Oregon Department of Environmental Quality, et al.
Other
Paul J. Beard II
    Counsel of Record
FisherBroyles LLP
4470 W. Sunset Blvd.
Suite 93165
Los Angeles, CA 90027

paul.beard@fisherbroyles.com
818-216-3988
Party name: American Mining Rights Association, et al.