No. 19-835
Title:Valero Energy Corporation, et al., Petitioners
v.
Environmental Protection Agency
Docketed:January 2, 2020
Linked with 19A546
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the District of Columbia Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-1055, 17-1047, 17-1051, 17-1259, 18-1029)
   Decision Date:August 30, 2019
Rule 12.4
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Nov 12 2019Application (19A546) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from November 28, 2019 (Nos. 16-1055, 17-1047, 17-1051, 17-1259 & 18-1029) and December 5, 2019 (No. 18-1027) to December 30, 2019, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Nov 19 2019Application (19A546) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until December 30, 2019.
Dec 30 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 3, 2020)
PetitionAppendixAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 24 2020Waiver of right of respondent American Petroleum Institute to respond filed.
Main Document
Jan 29 2020Waiver of right of respondent Growth Energy to respond filed.
Main Document
Jan 29 2020Motion of the Solicitor General to extend the time to file a response from February 3, 2020 to March 4, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jan 29 2020Waiver of right of respondent National Biodiesel Board to respond filed.
Main Document
Jan 29 2020Waiver of right of respondent Monroe Energy, LLC to respond filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jan 30 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including March 4, 2020.
Feb 03 2020Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by National Association of Home Builders of the United States.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 26 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 4, 2020 to April 3, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Feb 27 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including April 3, 2020.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Evan Andrew Young
    Counsel of Record
Baker Botts L.L.P.
98 San Jacinto Boulevard
Suite 1500
Austin, TX 78701-4078

evan.young@bakerbotts.com
5123222506
Party name: Valero Energy Corporation, et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Environmental Protection Agency
Bryan Michael Killian
    Counsel of Record
Morgan, Lewis & Bockius, LLP
1111 Pennsylvania Ave, NW
Washington, DC 20004

Bryan.killian@morganlewis.com
2023736191
Party name: National Biodiesel Board
Robert Allen Long Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Covington & Burling, LLP
One CityCenter
850 Tenth St., NW
Washington, DC 20001

rlong@cov.com
202-662-5612
Party name: American Petroleum Institute
Matthew Eben Price
    Counsel of Record
Jenner & Block, LLP
1099 New York Ave. NW, Suite 900
Washington, DC 20001

MPrice@jenner.com
202-639-6000
Party name: Monroe Energy, LLC
Seth P. Waxman
    Counsel of Record
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale and Dorr LLP
1875 Pennsylvania Ave, NW
Washington, DC 20006

Seth.Waxman@wilmerhale.com
202-663-6800
Party name: Growth Energy
Other
Amy Christine Chai
    Counsel of Record
National Association of Home Builders
1201 15th Street, NW
Washington, DC 20005

achai@nahb.org
2022668232
Party name: National Association of Home Builders of the United States