No. 19-827
Title:Territory of Guam, et al., Petitioners
v.
Arnold Davis
Docketed:December 31, 2019
Linked with 19A500
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-15719)
   Decision Date:July 29, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 28 2019Application (19A500) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from October 27, 2019 to December 26, 2019, submitted to Justice Kagan.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Nov 06 2019Application (19A500) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until December 26, 2019.
Dec 26 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due January 30, 2020)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 31 2019Waiver of right of respondent Arnold Davis to respond filed.
Main Document
Jan 15 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/21/2020.
Jan 21 2020Response Requested. (Due February 20, 2020)
Feb 03 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from February 20, 2020 to March 23, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Feb 03 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including March 23, 2020.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Michael Francis Williams
    Counsel of Record
Kirkland and Ellis LLP
1301 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20004

michael.williams@kirkland.com
202-389-5123
Party name: Guam, et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Lucas Cody Townsend
    Counsel of Record
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
1050 Connecticut Ave., N.W.
Washington, DC 20036

ltownsend@gibsondunn.com
202-887-3731
Party name: Arnold Davis