No. 19-825
Vide 19-508
Title:Federal Trade Commission, Petitioner
v.
Credit Bureau Center, LLC, et al.
Docketed:December 31, 2019
Linked with 19A517
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Seventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-2847, 18-3310)
   Decision Date:August 21, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Nov 08 2019Application (19A517) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from November 19, 2019 to December 19, 2019, submitted to Justice Kavanaugh.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Nov 08 2019Application (19A517) granted by Justice Kavanaugh extending the time to file until December 19, 2019.
Dec 19 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due January 30, 2020)
Petition
Jan 20 2020Conditional Cross Petition for a Writ of Certiorari of Credit Bureau Center, LLC, et al. not accepted for filing. (January 22, 2020)
Jan 30 2020Brief amici curiae of State of Illinois et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Apr 01 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/17/2020.
Apr 02 2020Response Requested. (Due May 4, 2020)
Apr 14 2020Brief of respondents Credit Bureau Center, LLC, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Apr 28 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/15/2020.
Apr 28 2020Reply of petitioners Federal Trade Commission filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jun 22 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/25/2020.
Jun 22 2020Supplemental brief of respondents Credit Bureau Center, LLC, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jun 29 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 7/1/2020.
Jul 08 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 7/8/2020.
Jul 09 2020Petition GRANTED. The petition for a writ of certiorari in No. 19-508 is granted. The cases are consolidated, and a total of one hour is allotted for oral argument. VIDED.
Jul 09 2020Because the Court has consolidated these cases for briefing and oral argument, future filings and activity in the cases will now be reflected on the docket of No. 19-508. Subsequent filings in these cases must therefore be submitted through the electronic filing system in No. 19-508. Each document submitted in connection with one or more of these cases must include on its cover the case number and caption for each case in which the filing is intended to be submitted. Where a filing is submitted in fewer than all of the cases, the docket entry will reflect the case number(s) in which the filing is submitted; a document filed in all of the consolidated cases will be noted as “VIDED.”

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Alden Francis Abbott
    Counsel of Record
Federal Trade Commission
600 Pennsylvania Avenue NW
Washington, DC 20580

aabbott@ftc.gov
202-326-2505
Party name: Federal Trade Commission
Attorneys for Respondents
Neal Kumar Katyal
    Counsel of Record
Hogan Lovells US LLP
555 Thirteenth St., N.W.
Washington, DC 20004

neal.katyal@hoganlovells.com
202 637 5528
Party name: Credit Bureau Center, LLC, et al.
Stephen R. CochellThe Cochell Law Firm, P.C.
5850 San Felipe
Houston, TX 77057

srcochell@gmail.com
3468003500
Party name: Credit Bureau Center, LLC, et al.
Other
Jane Elinor Notz
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General, State of Illinois
100 West Randolph Street, 12th Floor
Chicago, IL 60601

jnotz@atg.state.il.us
312-814-5376
Party name: State of Illinois et al.