No. 19-816
Title:Kristina Box, et al., Petitioners
v.
Planned Parenthood of Indiana and Kentucky, Inc.
Docketed:December 27, 2019
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Seventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-2428)
   Decision Date:August 27, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:October 30, 2019
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 27 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due January 27, 2020)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 13 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from January 27, 2020 to February 26, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jan 15 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including February 26, 2020.
Jan 27 2020Brief amicus curiae of Americans United for Life filed.
Proof of ServiceMain DocumentCertificate of Word Count
Jan 27 2020Brief amici curiae of Kentucky, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 27 2020Brief amici curiae of Priests for Life and Rachel's Vineyard filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Feb 26 2020Brief of respondent Planned Parenthood of Indiana and Kentucky, Inc. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 10 2020Reply of petitioners Kristina Box, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 11 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/27/2020.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Thomas M. Fisher
    Counsel of Record
Indiana AG's Office, IGC S., 5th Fl.
302 W. Washington
Indianapolis, IN 46204

tom.fisher@atg.in.gov
317-232-6255
Party name: Kristina Box, et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Kenneth J. Falk
    Counsel of Record
ACLU of Indiana
1031 E, Washington St.
Indianapolis, IN 46202

kfalk@aclu-in.org
3176354059
Party name: Planned Parenthood of Indiana and Kentucky, Inc.
Other
Steven Henry Aden
    Counsel of Record
Americans United for Life
1150 Connecticut Ave. NW
Suite 500
Washington, DC 20036

Steven.Aden@aul.org
2027414917
Party name: Americans United for Life
Stephen Chad Meredith
    Counsel of Record
Commonwealth of Kentucky, Office of the Attorney General
700 Capitol Avenue, Room 118
Frankfort, KY 40601

chad.meredith@ky.gov
502-696-5300
Party name: Kentucky, et al.
Robert Joseph Muise
    Counsel of Record
American Freedom Law Center
PO Box 131098
Ann Arbor, MI 48113

rmuise@americanfreedomlawcenter.org
7346353756
Party name: Priests for Life and Rachel's Vineyard