No. 19-815
Title:Lisa M. Phoenix, Petitioner
v.
Regions Bank
Docketed:December 27, 2019
Linked with 19A559
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-11736)
   Decision Date:August 28, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Nov 14 2019Application (19A559) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from November 26, 2019 to December 26, 2019, submitted to Justice Thomas.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Nov 20 2019Application (19A559) granted by Justice Thomas extending the time to file until December 26, 2019.
Dec 24 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due January 27, 2020)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 15 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from January 27, 2020 to February 26, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jan 17 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including February 26, 2020.
Feb 19 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from February 26, 2020 to March 30, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Feb 24 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including March 30, 2020.
Mar 27 2020Brief of Regions Bank in opposition submitted.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Mark Thomas Stancil
    Counsel of Record
Robbins, Russell, Englert, Orseck, Untereiner & Sauber LLP
2000 K Street, NW
4th Floor
Washington, DC 20006

mstancil@robbinsrussell.com
202-775-4520
Party name: Lisa M. Phoenix
Attorneys for Respondent
John Albert Anthony
    Counsel of Record
Anthony and Partners, LLC
201 N. Franklin St., Suite 2800
Tampa, FL 33602

janthony@anthonyandpartners.com
(813) 273-5616
Party name: Regions Bank