No. 19-807
Title:Bank Melli, Petitioner
v.
Michael Bennett, et al.
Docketed:December 26, 2019
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-15101)
   Decision Date:September 30, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 26 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due January 27, 2020)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 10 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from January 27, 2020 to February 26, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jan 14 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including February 26, 2020, for all respondents.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Robert K. Kry
    Counsel of Record
MoloLamken LLP
600 New Hampshire Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20037

rkry@mololamken.com
2025562011
Party name: Bank Melli
Attorneys for Respondents
Patrick Nicholas Petrocelli
    Counsel of Record
Stroock & Stroock & Lavan, LLP
180 Maiden Lane
New York, NY 10038

ppetrocelli@stroock.com
212-806-5400
Party name: Michael Bennett, et al.