No. 19-798
Title:Bay Point Properties, Incorporated, Petitioner
v.
Mississippi Transportation Commission, et al.
Docketed:December 23, 2019
Linked with 19A436
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-60674)
   Decision Date:August 27, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 17 2019Application (19A436) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from November 25, 2019 to December 20, 2019, submitted to Justice Alito.
Main Document
Oct 21 2019Application (19A436) granted by Justice Alito extending the time to file until December 20, 2019.
Dec 19 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due January 22, 2020)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 30 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from January 22, 2020 to February 20, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Dec 31 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including February 20, 2020.
Feb 20 2020Brief of respondents Mississippi Transportation Commission, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentOtherProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 05 2020Reply of petitioner Bay Point Properties, Incorporated filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 11 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/27/2020.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
J. David Breemer
    Counsel of Record
930 G Street
Sacramento, CA 95814

jbreemer@pacificlegal.org
(916) 419-7111
Party name: Bay Point Properties, Incorporated
Attorneys for Respondents
Christopher Martin Howdeshell
    Counsel of Record
Pittman Howdeshell, PLLC
Post Office Drawer 17138
Hattiesburg, MS 39404-7138

chris@pittmanlawfirm.net
(601) 264-3314
Party name: Mississippi Transportation Commission, et al.