No. 19-797
Title:City of St. Louis, Missouri, et al., Petitioners
v.
Mary R. Meier
Docketed:December 23, 2019
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eighth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-1597)
   Decision Date:August 19, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:September 25, 2019
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 19 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due January 22, 2020)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 06 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from January 22, 2020 to February 21, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jan 07 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including February 21, 2020.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Robert H. Dierker Jr.
    Counsel of Record
City Counselor
314 City Hall
1200 Market St.
St. Louis, MO 63103

dierkerr@stlouis-mo.gov
3146224378
Party name: City of St. Louis, Missouri, et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Michael Terence Kirkpatrick
    Counsel of Record
Public Citizen Litigation Group
1600 20th Street NW
Washington, DC 20009

mkirkpatrick@citizen.org
202-588-1000
Party name: Mary Meier