No. 19-794
Title:Daniel Macias, et al., Petitioners
v.
Raymond Nichols, et al.
Docketed:December 20, 2019
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-55135)
   Decision Date:August 22, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:October 1, 2019
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 18 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due January 21, 2020)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 13 2020Waiver of right of respondents Raymond Nichols, et al. to respond filed.
Main Document
Jan 29 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/21/2020.
Feb 10 2020Response Requested. (Due March 11, 2020)
Mar 11 2020Brief of respondents Raymond Nicholas, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 23 2020Reply of petitioners Daniel Macias, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 25 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/17/2020.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Alana H. Rotter
    Counsel of Record
Greines, Martin, Stein & Richland LLP
5900 Wilshire Blvd., 12th Floor
Los Angeles, CA 90036

arotter@gmsr.com
3108597811
Party name: Daniel Macias, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Brenton Whitney Aitken Hands
    Counsel of Record
Law Office of Jerry L. Steering
4063 Birch St., Suite #100
Newport Beach, CA 92660

brentonaitken@gmail.com
9494741849
Party name: Raymond Nicholas, et al.
Brenton W. Aitken HandsLaw Office of Jerry L. Steering
4063 Birch St., Suite 100
Newport Beach, CA 92660

949-474-1849
Party name: Raymond Nichols, et al.