No. 19-793
Title:Institute for Free Speech, Petitioner
v.
Xavier Becerra, Attorney General of California
Docketed:December 20, 2019
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-17403)
   Decision Date:October 11, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 18 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due January 21, 2020)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 14 2020Waiver of right of respondent Xavier Becerra, Attorney General of California to respond filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jan 17 2020Letter of January 15, 2020 from counsel for petitioner received.
Jan 21 2020Brief amicus curiae of The Cato Institute filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 22 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/21/2020.
Jan 30 2020Response Requested. (Due March 2, 2020)
Feb 19 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 2, 2020 to April 1, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Feb 25 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including April 1, 2020.
Feb 28 2020Brief amicus curiae of Liberty Justice Center filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 02 2020Brief amici curiae of Project for Privacy & Surveillance Accountability and Pacific Research Institute filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 24 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 1, 2020 to May 1, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Mar 25 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including May 1, 2020.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Allen Joseph Dickerson
    Counsel of Record
Institute for Free Speech
124 S. West Street
Suite 201
Alexandria, VA 22314

adickerson@ifs.org
7038946846
Party name: Institute for Free Speech
Attorneys for Respondent
Aimee Athena Feinberg
    Counsel of Record
California Department of Justice
1300 I Street
Sacramento, CA 95814

Aimee.Feinberg@doj.ca.gov
916-210-6003
Party name: Xavier Becerra, Attorney General of California
Other
Erik S. Jaffe
    Counsel of Record
Schaerr | Jaffe LLP
1717 K Street, N.W., Suite 900
Washington, DC 20006

ejaffe@schaerr-jaffe.com
202-415-7412
Party name: Project for Privacy & Surveillance Accountability and Pacific Research Institute
Daniel Robert Suhr
    Counsel of Record
Liberty Justice Center
190 S. LaSalle St., Suire 1500
Chicago, IL 60603

dsuhr@libertyjusticecenter.org
4145881658
Party name: Liberty Justice Center
Ilya Shapiro
    Counsel of Record
Cato Institute
1000 Massachusetts Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20001

ishapiro@cato.org
2028420200
Party name: The Cato Institute