No. 19-792
Title:Vugo, Inc., Petitioner
v.
City of New York, New York
Docketed:December 20, 2019
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-807)
   Decision Date:July 16, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:September 23, 2019
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 18 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due January 21, 2020)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 16 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from January 21, 2020 to March 20, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jan 17 2020Brief amicus curiae of Pacific Legal Foundation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 21 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including March 20, 2020.
Jan 21 2020Brief amici curiae of Goldwater Institute & Cato Institute filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 20 2020Brief of respondent City of New York in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Jeffrey Michael Schwab
    Counsel of Record
Liberty Justice Center
190 South LaSalle Street, Suite 1500
Chicago, IL 60603

jschwab@libertyjusticecenter.org
312-263-7668
Party name: Vugo, Inc.
Attorneys for Respondent
Richard Paul Dearing
    Counsel of Record
New York City Law Department
100 Church Street
New York, NY 10007

rdearing@law.nyc.gov
2123562500
Party name: City of New York
Other
Jacob H. Huebert
    Counsel of Record
Goldwater institute
500 E. Coronado Rd.
Phoenix, AZ 85004

jhuebert@goldwaterinstitute.org
6024625000
Party name: Goldwater Institute & Cato Institute
Daniel Moshe Ortner
    Counsel of Record
Pacific Legal Foundation
930 G Street
Sacramento, CA 95814

dortner@pacificlegal.org
9164197111
Party name: Pacific Legal Foundation