No. 19-7862 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:Wesley Paul Coonce, Jr., Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:March 3, 2020
Linked with 19A632
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eighth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(14-2800)
   Decision Date:July 25, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:October 4, 2019
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 04 2019Application (19A632) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from January 2, 2020 to March 2, 2020, submitted to Justice Gorsuch.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Dec 06 2019Application (19A632) granted by Justice Gorsuch extending the time to file until March 2, 2020.
Feb 28 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due April 2, 2020)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixProof of Service
Mar 27 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 2, 2020 to May 4, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Mar 30 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including May 4, 2020.
Apr 16 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from May 4, 2020 to June 3, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Apr 17 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including June 3, 2020.
Jun 03 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from June 3, 2020 to July 6, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jun 03 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including July 6, 2020.
Jul 02 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from July 6, 2020 to August 5, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jul 06 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including August 5, 2020.
Aug 03 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from August 5, 2020 to October 12, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Aug 05 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including October 13, 2020.
Oct 08 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from October 13, 2020 to December 1, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Oct 09 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including December 1, 2020.
Nov 30 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from December 1, 2020 to February 19, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Dec 01 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including February 19, 2021.
Feb 16 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from February 19, 2021 to April 20, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Feb 17 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including April 20, 2021.
Feb 26 2021Supplemental brief of petitioner Wesley Coonce, Jr. filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Apr 20 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 20, 2021 to June 21, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Apr 21 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including June 21, 2021.
Jun 16 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from June 21, 2021 to July 21, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jun 17 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including July 21, 2021.
Jul 21 2021Brief of respondent United States filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Aug 02 2021Reply of petitioner Wesley Coonce, Jr. filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Aug 05 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/27/2021.
Oct 04 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/8/2021.
Oct 12 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/15/2021.
Oct 25 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/29/2021.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Robert Charles Owen
    Counsel of Record
Law Office of Robert C. Owen, LLC
53 W. Jackson Blvd.
Suite 1056
Chicago, IL 60604

robowenlaw@gmail.com
5125778329
Party name: Wesley Coonce, Jr.
Attorneys for Respondent
Brian H. Fletcher
    Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States