No. 19-785 | |
Title: | James Huff, Petitioner v. Telecheck Services, Inc., et al. |
Docketed: | December 19, 2019 |
Linked with 19A394 | |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit |
Case Numbers: | (18-5438) |
Decision Date: | May 3, 2019 |
Rehearing Denied: | July 19, 2019 |
Date | Proceedings and Orders |
Oct 03 2019 | Application (19A394) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from October 17, 2019 to December 16, 2019, submitted to Justice Sotomayor. |
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service | |
Oct 10 2019 | Application (19A394) granted by Justice Sotomayor extending the time to file until December 16, 2019. |
Dec 11 2019 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due January 21, 2020) |
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Feb 05 2020 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/21/2020. |
Feb 24 2020 | Petition DENIED. |
NAME | ADDRESS | PHONE |
Attorneys for Petitioner | ||
Martin D. Holmes Counsel of Record | Dickinson Wright PLLC 424 Church Street Suite 800 Nashville, TN 37219 mdholmes@dickinsonwright.com | (615) 244-6538 |
Party name: James Huff, Individually and on Behalf of All Others Similarly Situated |