No. 19-783
Title:Nathan Van Buren, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:December 18, 2019
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-12024)
   Decision Date:October 10, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 18 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due January 17, 2020)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 07 2020Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Nathan Van Buren.
Blanket ConsentProof of Service
Jan 10 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from January 17, 2020 to February 18, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jan 13 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including February 18, 2020.
Jan 17 2020Brief amicus curiae of National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 17 2020Brief amici curiae of Electronic Frontier Foundation, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 31 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from February 18, 2020 to March 10, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jan 31 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including March 10, 2020.
Mar 10 2020Brief of respondent United States of America in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Mar 18 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/3/2020.
Mar 18 2020Reply of petitioner Nathan Van Buren filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Apr 13 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/17/2020.
Apr 20 2020Petition GRANTED.
Apr 29 2020Motion for an extension of time to file the briefs on the merits filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
May 06 2020Motion to extend the time to file the briefs on the merits granted. The time to file the joint appendix and petitioner's brief on the merits is extended to and including July 1, 2020. The time to file respondent's brief on the merits is extended to and including August 27, 2020.
Jun 04 2020Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Nathan Van Buren
Blanket ConsentProof of Service
Jul 01 2020Joint appendix filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jul 01 2020Brief of petitioner Nathan Van Buren filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 07 2020Brief amici curiae of The R Street Institute, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 07 2020Brief amici curiae of Kyratso Karahalios, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 07 2020Brief amicus curiae of Association of Medical Device Service Organizations filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 07 2020Brief amicus curiae of Association of Medical Device Reprocessors filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 08 2020Brief amicus curiae of National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 08 2020Brief amicus curiae of Committee for Justice filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 08 2020Brief amicus curiae of Americans for Prosperity Foundation filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jul 08 2020Brief amici curiae of Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jul 08 2020Brief amici curiae of National Whistleblower Center filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 08 2020Brief amicus curiae of The United States Technology Policy Committee of the ACM in support of neither party filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 08 2020Brief amici curiae of Technology Companies filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 08 2020Brief amicus curiae of Orin S. Kerr filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 08 2020Brief amici curiae of Computer Security Researchers, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 08 2020Brief amicus curiae of The Markup filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 27 2020Brief of respondent United States filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Aug 31 2020Brief amicus curiae of Federal Law Enforcement Officers Association filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 01 2020Brief amicus curiae of Managed Funds Association filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 02 2020Brief amici curiae of Karen Heart and Anthony Volini of CIPLIT filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 03 2020Brief amici curiae of Electronic Privacy Information Center, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 03 2020Brief amicus curiae of Voatz, Inc. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 03 2020Brief amicus curiae of Digital Justice Foundation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 16 2020SET FOR ARGUMENT on Monday, November 30, 2020.
Sep 28 2020Reply of petitioner Nathan Van Buren filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 08 2020Record requested from the U.S.C.A. 11th Circuit.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Jeffrey L. Fisher
    Counsel of Record
Stanford Law School Supreme Court Litigation Clinic
559 Nathan Abbott Way
Stanford, CA 94305

jlfisher@law.stanford.edu
(650) 724-7081
Party name: Nathan Van Buren
Attorneys for Respondent
Jeffrey B. Wall
    Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Other
Clifford Warren Berlow
    Counsel of Record
Jenner & Block LLP
353 North Clark Street
Chicago, IL 60654

cberlow@jenner.com
312-840-7366
Party name: National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers
Esha Bhandari
    Counsel of Record
American Civil Liberties Union Foundation
125 Broad Street, 18th Floor
New York, NY 10004

ebhandari@aclu.org
212-549-2500
Party name: Kyratso Karahalios, et al.
Katherine M. Bolger
    Counsel of Record
Davis Wright & Tremaine LLP
1251 Avenue of the Americas
New York, NY 10020

KateBolger@dwt.com
212-489-8230
Party name: The Markup
Alan Jay Butler
    Counsel of Record
Electronic Privacy Information Center
1519 New Hampshire Avenue NW
Washington, DC 20036

butler@epic.org
2024831140
Party name: Electronic Privacy Information Center, et al.
Andrew Gellis Crocker
    Counsel of Record
Electronic Frontier Foundation
815 Eddy Street
San Francisco, CA 94109

andrew@eff.org
(415) 436-9333
Party name: Electronic Frontier Foundation, et al.
Edward Francis Cunningham
    Counsel of Record
Law Office of Edward F. Cunningham
62 Cambridge Avenue
Garden City, NY 11530

ed@edcunninghamlaw.com
5163283705
Party name: Digital Justice Foundation
Joseph Vecchione DeMarco
    Counsel of Record
DeVore & DeMarco LLP
99 Park Avenue, Suite 1100
New York, NY 10016

jvd@devoredemarco.com
917-576-2369
Party name: Managed Funds Association
Joseph Vecchione DeMarco
    Counsel of Record
DeVore & DeMarco LLP
99 Park Avenue, Suite 1100
New York, NY 10016

jvd@devoredemarco.com
917-576-2369
Party name: Federal Law Enforcement Officers Association
Anthony John Dick
    Counsel of Record
Jones Day
51 Louisiana Ave NW
Washington, DC 20001

ajdick@jonesday.com
2028793939
Party name: Committee for Justice
John Garfield Dillard
    Counsel of Record
Olsson Frank Weeda Terman Matz PC
2000 Pennsylvania Ave., NW
Suite 3000
Washington, DC 20006

jdillard@ofwlaw.com
2025186349
Party name: Association of Medical Device Service Organizations
Charles Duan
    Counsel of Record
R Street Institute
1212 New York Ave NW Suite 900
Washington, DC 20005

cduan@rstreet.org
(202) 525-5717
Party name: The R Street Institute, Public Knowledge, Lincoln Network, Engine Advocacy, the Innovation Defense Foundation, and the American Antitrust Institute
Andrew Grosso
    Counsel of Record
Andrew Grosso & Associates
1101 30th Street, Northwest
Suite 300
Washington, DC 20007

Agrosso@acm.org
(202) 298-6500
Party name: The United States Technology Policy Committee of the ACM
Karen Heart
    Counsel of Record
Attorney at Law
1040 Thomas Ave.
Forest Park, IL 60130-2319

kheart@depaul.edu
7089969278
Party name: Karen Heart and Anthony Volini of CIPLIT
Jared Lee Hubbard
    Counsel of Record
Fitch Law Partners LLP
One Beacon Street
Boston, MA 02108

jlh@fitchlp.com
6175425542
Party name: Voatz, Inc.
Orin S. Kerr
    Counsel of Record
334 North Addition
Berkeley, CA 94720-7200

orin@orinkerr.com
(510)664-5257
Party name: Orin S. Kerr
Stephen M. Kohn
    Counsel of Record
Kohn, Kohn & Colapinto, LLP
1710 N Street N.W.
Washington, DC 20036

sk@kkc.com
(202) 342-6980
Party name: National Whistleblower Center
Mark A. Lemley
    Counsel of Record
Durie Tangri LLP
217 Leidesdorff Street
San Francisco, CA 94111

mlemley@durietangri.com
415-362-6666
Party name: Technology Companies
Kannon K. Shanmugam
    Counsel of Record
Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison LLP
2001 K Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20006

kshanmugam@paulweiss.com
(202) 223-7300
Party name: Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press, et al.
Stephen David Terman
    Counsel of Record
Olsson Frank Weeda Terman Bode Matz PC
2000 Pennsylvania Ave., NW
Suite 3000
Washington, DC 20006

mweeda@ofwlaw.com
2024868384
Party name: Association of Medical Device Reprocessors
Russel James Valvo III
    Counsel of Record
Americans for Prosperity Foundation
1310 N. Courthouse Road, Ste. 700
Arlington, VA 22201

jvalvo@afphq.org
(571) 329-4420
Party name: Americans for Prosperity Foundation