No. 19-779
Title:Jordany Pierre-Paul, Petitioner
v.
William P. Barr, Attorney General
Docketed:December 17, 2019
Linked with 19A395
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-60275)
   Decision Date:July 18, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 04 2019Application (19A395) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from October 16, 2019 to December 15, 2019, submitted to Justice Alito.
Oct 04 2019Pursuant to Rule 34.6 and Paragraph 9 of the Guidelines for the Submission of Documents to the Supreme Court's Electronic Filing System, filings in this case should be submitted in paper form only, and shoiuld not be submitted through the Court's electronic filing system.
Oct 08 2019Application (19A395) granted by Justice Alito extending the time to file until December 15, 2019.
Dec 16 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due January 16, 2020)
Jan 10 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from January 16, 2020 to February 18, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Jan 13 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including February 18, 2020.
Jan 21 2020Brief amici curiae of Former Immigration Judges and Members of the Board of Immigration Appeals filed.
Feb 14 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from February 18, 2020 to March 19, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Feb 18 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including March 19, 2020.
Mar 19 2020Brief of respondent William P. Barr, Attorney General in opposition filed.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Aaron Michael Streett
    Counsel of Record
Baker Botts, L.L.P.
910 Louisiana Street
Houston, TX 77002

aaron.streett@bakerbotts.com
7132291855
Party name: Jordany Pierre-Paul
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Barr, Att'y Gen.
Other
Shane Andrew Pennington
    Counsel of Record
Yetter Coleman LLP
811 Main Street Suite 4100
Houston, TX 77002

spennington@yettercoleman.com
713-633-8002
Party name: Former Immigration Judges and Members of the Board of Immigration Appeals