No. 19-7714
Title:Angelique de Maison, Petitioner
v.
Securities and Exchange Commission
Docketed:February 20, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-2564)
   Decision Date:August 30, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:November 19, 2019
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Feb 18 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due March 23, 2020)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 23 2020Brief of respondent Securities and Exchange Commission in opposition filed.
Certificate of Word CountMain Document
Apr 09 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/24/2020.
Jun 22 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/25/2020.
Jun 29 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 7/1/2020.
Jul 02 2020Motion to proceed in forma pauperis and petition for a writ of certiorari GRANTED. Judgment VACATED and case REMANDED for further consideration in light of Liu v. SEC, 591 U. S. ___ (2020).

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Jeffrey Bruce Coopersmith
    Counsel of Record
Orrick, Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP
701 Fifth Avenue, Suite 5600
Seattle, WA 98104

jcoopersmith@orrick.com
(206) 839-4300
Party name: Angelique Maison
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Securities and Exchange Commission