No. 19-7689 *** CAPITAL CASE *** | |
Title: | Nicholas Todd Sutton, Petitioner v. Tennessee |
Docketed: | February 18, 2020 |
Linked with 19A910 | |
Lower Ct: | Court of Criminal Appeals of Tennessee, Eastern Division |
Case Numbers: | (E2018-00877-CCA-R3-PD) |
Decision Date: | January 31, 2020 |
Discretionary Court Decision Date: | February 14, 2020 |
Date | Proceedings and Orders |
Feb 18 2020 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due March 19, 2020) |
PetitionAppendixMotion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisProof of Service | |
Feb 18 2020 | Application (19A910) for a stay of execution of sentence of death, submitted to Justice Sotomayor. |
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsLower Court Orders/OpinionsLower Court Orders/OpinionsLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service | |
Feb 19 2020 | Brief of respondent Tennessee in opposition filed. |
Main DocumentOther | |
Feb 19 2020 | Reply of petitioner Nicholas Todd Sutton filed. |
Main DocumentProof of Service | |
Feb 20 2020 | Application (19A910) referred to the Court. |
Feb 20 2020 | Petition DENIED. |
Feb 20 2020 | Application (19A910) denied by the Court. |
NAME | ADDRESS | PHONE |
Attorneys for Petitioner | ||
Stephen Michael Kissinger Counsel of Record | Federal Defender Services of Eastern Tennessee 800 S. Gay Street Suite 2400 Knoxville, TN 37929 Stephen_Kissinger@fd.org | 8656377979 |
Party name: Nicholas Sutton | ||
Attorneys for Respondent | ||
Zachary Thomas Hinkle Counsel of Record | Tennessee Attorney General & Reporter P.O. Box 20207 Nashville, TN 37202 zachary.hinkle@ag.tn.gov | 6155320986 |
Party name: State of Tennessee |