No. 19-7685 | |
Title: | Dominic Lindsey, Petitioner v. United States |
Docketed: | February 18, 2020 |
Linked with 19A637 | |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit |
Case Numbers: | (18-10604) |
Decision Date: | August 9, 2019 |
Rehearing Denied: | September 18, 2019 |
Date | Proceedings and Orders |
Dec 06 2019 | Application (19A637) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from December 17, 2019 to January 16, 2020, submitted to Justice Alito. |
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service | |
Dec 09 2019 | Application (19A637) granted by Justice Alito extending the time to file until January 16, 2020. |
Jan 06 2020 | Application (19A637) to extend further the time from January 16, 2020 to February 15, 2020, submitted to Justice Alito. |
Written RequestProof of Service | |
Jan 06 2020 | Application (19A637) granted by Justice Alito extending the time to file until February 15, 2020. |
Feb 14 2020 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due March 19, 2020) |
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Mar 10 2020 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 19, 2020 to April 20, 2020, submitted to The Clerk. |
Main Document | |
Mar 11 2020 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including April 20, 2020. |
Apr 17 2020 | Memorandum of respondent United States filed. |
Proof of ServiceMain Document | |
May 06 2020 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/21/2020. |
May 26 2020 | Motion to proceed in forma pauperis and petition for a writ of certiorari GRANTED. Judgment VACATED and case REMANDED for further consideration in light of Davis v. United States, 589 U. S. ___ (2020) (per curiam). |
Jun 29 2020 | JUDGMENT ISSUED. |
NAME | ADDRESS | PHONE |
Attorneys for Petitioner | ||
Kevin Joel Page Counsel of Record | 525 S. Griffin Street Suite 629 Dallas, TX 75202 joel_page@fd.org | 214-767-2746 |
Party name: Dominic Lindsey | ||
Attorneys for Respondent | ||
Noel J. Francisco Counsel of Record | Solicitor General United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW Washington, DC 20530-0001 SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov | 202-514-2217 |
Party name: United States |