No. 19-766
Title:North Carolina, Petitioner
v.
James Harold Courtney, III
Docketed:December 16, 2019
Linked with 19A437
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of North Carolina
   Case Numbers:(160PA18)
   Decision Date:August 16, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 15 2019Application (19A437) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from November 14, 2019 to December 13, 2019, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/Opinions
Oct 21 2019Application (19A437) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until December 13, 2019.
Dec 12 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due January 15, 2020)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 03 2020Waiver of right of respondent James H. Courtney, III to respond filed.
Main Document
Jan 15 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/21/2020.
Jan 17 2020Response Requested. (Due February 18, 2020)
Jan 24 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from February 18, 2020 to March 19, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jan 28 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including March 19, 2020.
Mar 19 2020Motion of James H. Courtney, III for leave to proceed in forma pauperis submitted.
Main DocumentOtherProof of ServiceProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Matthew W. Sawchak
    Counsel of Record
North Carolina Dept. of Justice
P.O. Box 629
Raleigh, NC 27602

msawchak@ncdoj.gov
(919) 716-6429
Party name: North Carolina
Attorneys for Respondent
Amanda Susan Zimmer
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Appellate Defender
123 West Main Street, Suite 500
Durham, NC 27701

amanda.s.zimmer@nccourts.org
919.354.7210
Party name: James H. Courtney, III