No. 19-764
Title:Mark I. Sokolow, et al., Petitioners
v.
Palestine Liberation Organization, et al.
Docketed:December 16, 2019
Linked with 19A283
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit
   Case Numbers:(15-3135, 15-3151)
   Decision Date:June 3, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:July 23, 2019
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Sep 10 2019Application (19A283) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from October 21, 2019 to December 20, 2019, submitted to Justice Ginsburg.
Main Document
Sep 12 2019Application (19A283) granted by Justice Ginsburg extending the time to file until December 20, 2019.
Dec 13 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due January 15, 2020)
PetitionProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Dec 20 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from January 15, 2020 to March 16, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Dec 23 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including March 16, 2020.
Jan 15 2020Motion for leave to file amici brief filed by Senator Charles Grassley, et al.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jan 21 2020Response to motion of amicus curiae brief by Senator Charles Grassley, et al. from respondents Palestine Liberation Organization, et al. filed.
Main DocumentOtherProof of Service
Jan 30 2020Supplemental brief of petitioners Mark Sokolow, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 13 2020Brief of respondents Palestine Liberation Organization, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 25 2020Motion of petitioner to delay distribution of the petition for a writ of certiorari under Rule 15.5 from April 1, 2020 to April 8, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Mar 26 2020Motion to delay distribution of the petition for a writ certiorari until April 8, 2020, granted.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
John Patrick Elwood
    Counsel of Record
Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer LLP
601 Massachusetts Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20001

john.elwood@arnoldporter.com
(202) 942-5992
Party name: Mark Sokolow, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Gassan Adnan Baloul
    Counsel of Record
Squire Patton Boggs (US)
2550 M Street NW
Washington, DC 20037

gassan.baloul@squirepb.com
2024576155
Party name: Palestine Liberation Organization, et al.
Other
Joseph Carl Cecere
    Counsel of Record
Cecere, PC
6035 McCommas Blvd.
Dallas, TX 75206

ccecere@cecerepc.com
469-600-9455
Party name: Senator Charles Grassley, et al.