No. 19-755
Title:Robert C. Steiner, et ux., Petitioners
v.
Utah State Tax Commission
Docketed:December 12, 2019
Linked with 19A426
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Utah
   Case Numbers:(20180223)
   Decision Date:August 14, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 17 2019Application (19A426) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from November 12, 2019 to December 12, 2019, submitted to Justice Sotomayor.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Oct 18 2019Application (19A426) granted by Justice Sotomayor extending the time to file until December 12, 2019.
Dec 12 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due January 13, 2020)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 13 2020Brief amicus curiae of American Legislative Exchange Council filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 13 2020Brief amicus curiae of Council On State Taxation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 13 2020Waiver of right of respondent Utah State Tax Commission to respond filed.
Main Document
Jan 13 2020Brief amici curiae of Professors Michael S. Knoll and Donald T. Williamson, and the Kogod Tax Policy Center filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 22 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/21/2020.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Neal Kumar Katyal
    Counsel of Record
Hogan Lovells US LLP
555 Thirteenth St., N.W.
Washington, DC 20004

neal.katyal@hoganlovells.com
202 637 5528
Party name: Robert C. Steiner, et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Tyler Green
    Counsel of Record
Utah Solicitor General
350 N. State Street, Suite 230
Salt Lake City, UT 84114-2320

tylergreen@agutah.gov
(801) 538-9600
Party name: Utah State Tax Commission
Other
Joseph Carl Cecere
    Counsel of Record
Cecere, PC
6035 McCommas Blvd.
Dallas, TX 75206

ccecere@cecerepc.com
469-600-9455
Party name: Professors Michael S. Knoll and Donald T. Williamson, and the Kogod Tax Policy Center
Karl A. Frieden
    Counsel of Record
Council On State Taxation
122 C Street NW, Suite 330
Washington, DC 20001

kfrieden@cost.org
2024845215
Party name: Council On State Taxation
Jonathon Paul Hauenschild
    Counsel of Record
American Legislative Exchange Council
2900 Crystal Dr. Ste. 600
Arlington, VA 22202

jphauens@gmail.com
5714825021
Party name: American Legislative Exchange Council