No. 19-753
Title:Michael Hunter, et al., Petitioners
v.
Randy Cole, et al.
Docketed:December 12, 2019
Linked with 19A510
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(14-10228, 15-10045)
   Decision Date:August 20, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Nov 05 2019Application (19A510) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from November 18, 2019 to December 9, 2019, submitted to Justice Alito.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Nov 07 2019Application (19A510) granted by Justice Alito extending the time to file until December 9, 2019.
Dec 09 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due January 13, 2020)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 13 2020Brief amici curiae of International Association of Chiefs of Police, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 28 2020Waiver of right of respondents Randy Cole, et al. to respond filed.
Main Document
Jan 29 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/21/2020.
Jan 31 2020Response Requested. (Due March 2, 2020)

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
James T. Jeffrey Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Law Offices of Jim Jeffrey
3200 W. Arkansas Lane
Arlington, TX 76016

jim.jeffrey@sbcglobal.net
817-261-3200
Party name: Martin Hunter, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Amir H. Ali
    Counsel of Record
Roderick & Solange MacArthur Justice Center
777 6th St. NW
11th Floor
Washington, DC 20001

amir.ali@macarthurjustice.org
202-869-3434
Party name: Randy Cole, et al.
Other
Megan Suarez Mahan
    Counsel of Record
City of Grand Prairie, Texas (Deputy City Attorney's Office)
300 West Main Street
Grand Prairie, TX 75050

mmahan@gptx.org
972-237-8025
Party name: Chielfs of Police, et al.,