No. 19-75
Title:James Joseph Garner, Petitioner
v.
Colorado
Docketed:July 15, 2019
Linked with 18A1244
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Colorado
   Case Numbers:(16SC75)
   Decision Date:March 18, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
May 29 2019Application (18A1244) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from June 16, 2019 to July 17, 2019, submitted to Justice Sotomayor.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of ServiceOther
May 31 2019Application (18A1244) granted by Justice Sotomayor extending the time to file until July 17, 2019.
Jul 15 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due August 14, 2019)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 25 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from August 14, 2019 to September 19, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jul 25 2019Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, James Garner.
Blanket ConsentProof of Service
Jul 26 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including September 19, 2019.
Jul 29 2019Blanket Consent filed by Respondent, Colorado.
Blanket ConsentProof of Service
Aug 14 2019Brief amici curiae of Scholars of Law, Psychology, Neuroscience, and other Fields filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 14 2019Brief amicus curiae of National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Jeffrey L. Fisher
    Counsel of Record
Stanford Law School Supreme Court Clinic
559 Nathan Abbott Way
Stanford, CA 94305

jlfisher@law.stanford.edu
(650) 724-7081
Party name: James Garner
Attorneys for Respondent
L. Andrew Cooper
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Colorado Attorney General
1300 Broadway St.
Denver, CO 80203

andrew.cooper@coag.gov
720-508-6465
Party name: Colorado
Other
Sean Hecker
    Counsel of Record
Kaplan Hecker & Fink LLP
350 Fifth Avenue
Suite 7110
New York, NY 10118

shecker@kaplanhecker.com
(212) 763-0883
Party name: National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers
Geoffrey M. Wyatt
    Counsel of Record
Skadden, Arps, Slate, Meagher & Flom, LLP
1440 New York Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC 20005

geoffrey.wyatt@skadden.com
202-371-7008
Party name: Scholars of Law, Psychology, Neuroscience, and other Fields