No. 19-743
Title:Curtis T. Hill, Jr., Attorney General of Indiana, et al., Petitioners
v.
Whole Woman's Health Alliance, et al.
Docketed:December 11, 2019
Linked with 19A532
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Seventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-2051)
   Decision Date:August 22, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Nov 08 2019Application (19A532) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from November 20, 2019 to January 15, 2020, submitted to Justice Kavanaugh.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Nov 14 2019Application (19A532) granted by Justice Kavanaugh extending the time to file until January 15, 2020.
Dec 09 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due January 10, 2020)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 07 2020Waiver of right of respondents Whole Woman's Health Alliance, et al. to respond filed.
Main Document
Jan 10 2020Brief amici curiae of Kentucky,et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 15 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/21/2020.
Jan 21 2020Response Requested. (Due February 20, 2020)

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Thomas M. Fisher
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Indiana Attorney General
IGC South, 5th Floor
302 W. Washington
Indianapolis, IN 46204

tom.fisher@atg.in.gov
317-232-6255
Party name: Curtis T. Hill, Jr., et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Stephanie Toti
    Counsel of Record
Lawyering Project
25 Broadway
9th Floor
New York, NY 10004

stoti@lawyeringproject.org
646-490-1083
Party name: Whole Woman's Health Alliance, et al.
Other
Stephen Chad Meredith
    Counsel of Record
Commonwealth of Kentucky, Office of the Attorney General
700 Capitol Avenue, Room 118
Frankfort, KY 40601

chad.meredith@ky.gov
502-696-5300
Party name: Kentucky