No. 19-741
Title:Estate of Esther Klieman, By and Through Its Administrator, Aaron Kesner, et al., Petitioners
v.
Palestinian Authority, aka Palestinian Interim Self-Government Authority, et al.
Docketed:December 11, 2019
Linked with 19A296
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the District of Columbia Circuit
   Case Numbers:(15-7034)
   Decision Date:May 14, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:July 8, 2019
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Sep 11 2019Application (19A296) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from October 6, 2019 to December 5, 2019, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Sep 16 2019Application (19A296) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until December 5, 2019.
Dec 05 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due January 10, 2020)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 20 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from January 10, 2020 to March 13, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Dec 20 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including March 13, 2020.
Jan 31 2020Supplemental brief of petitioners Estate of Esther Klieman, by and through its Administrator, Aaron Kesner, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 13 2020Brief of respondents Palestinian Authority, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 25 2020Motion of petitioner to delay distribution of the petition for a writ of certiorari under Rule 15.5 from April 1, 2020 to April 8, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Mar 26 2020Motion to delay distribution of the petition for a writ certiorari until April 8, 2020, granted.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Steven Robert Perles
    Counsel of Record
Perles Law Firm, PC
1050 Connecticut Ave, NW
Suite 500
Washington, DC 20036

sperles@perleslaw.com
2029559055
Party name: Estate of Esther Klieman, by and through it's Administrator, Aaron Kesner, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Gassan Adnan Baloul
    Counsel of Record
Squire Patton Boggs (US)
2550 M Street NW
Washington, DC 20037

gassan.baloul@squirepb.com
2024576155
Party name: Palestinian Authority, et al.