No. 19-735
Title:William Tong, Attorney General of Connecticut, Petitioner
v.
Tweed-New Haven Airport Authority, et al.
Docketed:December 10, 2019
Linked with 19A347
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-3481, 17-3918)
   Decision Date:July 9, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Sep 24 2019Application (19A347) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from October 7, 2019 to December 6, 2019, submitted to Justice Ginsburg.
Main Document
Sep 27 2019Application (19A347) granted by Justice Ginsburg extending the time to file until December 6, 2019.
Dec 06 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due January 9, 2020)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 16 2019Waiver of right of respondent City of New Haven to respond filed.
Main Document
Dec 16 2019Waiver of right of respondent Tweed-New Haven Airport Authority to respond filed.
Main Document
Dec 30 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/17/2020.
Jan 10 2020Response Requested. (Due February 10, 2020)
Feb 10 2020Brief of respondent City of New Haven,et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Feb 10 2020Brief of Tweed-New Haven Airport Authority in opposition submitted.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Clare Elmendorf Kindall
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General
165 Capitol Avenue
Hartford, CT 06106

Clare.Kindall@ct.gov
860-808-5261
Party name: William Tong
Attorneys for Respondents
Mark W. Mosier
    Counsel of Record
Covington & Burling, LLP
One CityCenter 850 Tenth Street, NW
Washington, DC 20001

mmosier@cov.com
202-662-5435
Party name: Tweed-New Haven Airport Authority
Mark W. Mosier
    Counsel of Record
Covington & Burling, LLP
One CityCenter 850 Tenth Street, NW
Washington, DC 20001

mmosier@cov.com
202-662-5435
Party name: City of New Haven
John RoseCity of Haven - Office of Corporation Counsel
165 Church St. 4th Floor
New Haven, CT 06510

jrose@newhavenct.gov
203-946-7951
Party name: City of New Haven