No. 19-7309 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:James Milton Dailey, Petitioner
v.
Florida
Docketed:January 15, 2020
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Florida
   Case Numbers:(SC18-557)
   Decision Date:October 3, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:October 14, 2019
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jan 10 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due February 14, 2020)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixProof of Service
Jan 17 2020Motion for leave to file amici brief filed by United States Conference of Catholic Bishops and Florida Conference of Catholic Bishops, Inc.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 17 2020Brief amici curiae of Former or Current Prosecutors and Attorneys General filed.
Motion for Leave to FileMain DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 31 2020Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by Conservatives Concerned About The Death Penalty.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Feb 13 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from February 14, 2020 to February 24, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Feb 18 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including February 24, 2020.
Feb 24 2020Brief of respondent Florida in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 11 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/27/2020.
Mar 11 2020Reply of petitioner James Dailey filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of Service
Mar 19 2020Rescheduled.
Jun 17 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/29/2020.
Oct 05 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/9/2020.
Oct 13 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/16/2020.
Oct 26 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/30/2020.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Laura A. Fernandez
    Counsel of Record
127 Wall Street
New Haven, CT 06511

laura.fernandez@yale.edu
2034321779
Party name: James Milton Dailey
Chelsea Rae ShirleyCapital Collateral Regional Counsel
12973 Telecom Parkway
Temple Terrace, FL 33637

shirley@ccmr.state.fl.us
850-558-1615
Party name: James Dailey
Attorneys for Respondent
Amitabh Agarwal
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General
The Capitol PL-01
Tallahassee, FL 32399-1050

amit.agarwal@myfloridalegal.com
850-414-3688
Party name: Florida
Other
Karen Marcia Gottlieb
    Counsel of Record
Florida Center for Capital Representation at FIU College of Law
11200 S.W. 8th Street, RDB 1010
Miami, FL 33199

karen.m.gottlieb@gmail.com
305-778-3240
Party name: Former or Current Prosecutors and Attorneys General
Owen C. Pell
    Counsel of Record
White & Case LLP
1221 Avenue of the Americas
New York, NY 10020-1095

opell@whitecase.com
212-819-8891
Party name: United States Conference of Catholic Bishops and Florida Conference of Catholic Bishops, Inc.
Brett Johnston Williamson
    Counsel of Record
Suite 1700
610 Newport Center Drive
Newport Beach, CA 92660-6429

bwilliamson@omm.com
(949)-760-9600
Party name: Conservatives Concerned About The Death Penalty