No. 19-723
Title:Oliver Lee White, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:December 9, 2019
Linked with 19A238
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-6181)
   Decision Date:June 18, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:August 16, 2019
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Sep 06 2019Application (19A238) for a stay of mandate pending the filing and disposition of a petition for a writ of certiorari, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Sep 11 2019Application (19A238) denied by The Chief Justice.
Nov 14 2019Motion (19M75) for leave to file a petition for a writ of certiorari under seal with redacted copies for the public record filed.
Nov 14 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due January 8, 2020)
PetitionAppendixAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 20 2019MOTION (19M75) DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/6/2019.
Dec 09 2019Motion (19M75) for leave to file a petition for a writ of certiorari under seal with redacted copies for the public record Granted.
Jan 08 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from January 8, 2020 to February 7, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jan 09 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including February 7, 2020.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Jaclyn L. DiLauro
    Counsel of Record
Assistant Federal Public Defender
150 Fayetteville Street, Suite 450
Raleigh, NC 27601

jackie_dilauro@fd.org
(919) 856-4236
Party name: Oliver Lee White
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States