No. 19-715
Title:Donald J. Trump, et al., Petitioners
v.
Mazars USA, LLP, et al.
Docketed:December 5, 2019
Linked with 19A545, 19A773, 19A862
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the District of Columbia Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-5142)
   Decision Date:October 11, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:November 13, 2019
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Nov 15 2019Application (19A545) for a stay of mandate pending the filing and disposition of a petition for a writ of certiorari, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Nov 18 2019Letter of respondent Committee on Oversight and Reform of the U.S. House of Representatives received.
Main Document
Nov 18 2019UPON CONSIDERATION of the application of counsel for the applicants and the November 18, 2019 letter received from counsel for respondent the Committee on Oversight and Reform of the U.S. House of Representatives, IT IS ORDERED that the mandate of the United States Court of Appeals for the District of Columbia Circuit, case No. 19-5142, is hereby stayed pending receipt of a response, due on or before Thursday, November 21, 2019, by 3 p.m. ET, and further order of the undersigned or of the Court.
Nov 21 2019Response to application from respondent Committee on Oversight and Reform of the U.S. House of Representatives filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Nov 22 2019Reply of applicant Donald Trump, et al. filed.
ReplyProof of Service
Nov 25 2019Application (19A545) referred to the Court.
Nov 25 2019Application (19A545) granted by the Court. The application for stay of the mandate presented to The Chief Justice and by him referred to the Court is granted. The issuance of the mandate of the United States Court of Appeals for the District of Columbia Circuit, case No. 19-5142, is stayed pending the filing and disposition of a petition for a writ of certiorari, if such petition is filed on or before December 5, 2019, by noon. Should the petition for a writ of certiorari be denied, this stay shall terminate automatically. In the event the petition for a writ of certiorari is granted, the stay shall terminate upon the issuance of the judgment of this Court. If no petition for a writ of certiorari is filed on or before December 5, 2019, by noon, the stay shall terminate.
Dec 04 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due January 6, 2020)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 11 2019Brief of respondent Committee on Oversight and Reform of the U.S. House of Representatives in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 12 2019Reply of petitioners Donald J. Trump, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 13 2019Petition GRANTED. The application (19A640) for stay presented to Justice Ginsburg and by her referred to the Court is granted, and it is ordered that the mandate of the United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit, case No. 19-1540, is hereby stayed pending further order of the Court. In addition, the application is treated as a petition for a writ of certiorari, and the petition is granted. The cases are consolidated, and a total of one hour is allotted for oral argument. The cases will be set for argument in the March 2020 argument session. VIDED.
Dec 13 2019Because the Court has consolidated these cases for briefing and oral argument, future filings and activity in the cases will now be reflected on the docket of No. 19-715. Subsequent filings in these cases must therefore be submitted through the electronic filing system in No. 19-715. Each document submitted in connection with one or more of these cases must include on its cover the case number and caption for each case in which the filing is intended to be submitted. Where a filing is submitted in fewer than all of the cases, the docket entry will reflect the case number(s) in which the filing is submitted; a document filed in all of the consolidated cases will be noted as “VIDED.” (December 16, 2019).
Jan 07 2020Application (19A773) to file a consolidated petitioners' brief on the merits in excess of the word limit, and a consolidated reply brief on the merits in excess of the word limit, submitted to The Chief Justice. VIDED.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jan 08 2020Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Donald J. Trump, et al. VIDED.
Blanket Consent
Jan 13 2020Application (19A773) to file a consolidated petitioners' brief on the merits in excess of the word limit, and a consolidated reply brief on the merits in excess of the word limit is granted by The Chief Justice provided that petitioners' brief does not exceed 17,000 words and the reply brief does not exceed 8,000 words. VIDED.
Jan 15 2020Blanket Consent filed by Respondent, Deutsche Bank AG.(in 19-760)
Blanket Consent
Jan 15 2020Letter of respondent Deutsche Bank AG notifying the Clerk that it does not intend to participate in these cases filed (in 19-760).
Main Document
Jan 24 2020Blanket Consent filed by Respondent, Committee on Oversight and Reform of the U.S. House of Representatives. VIDED.
Blanket Consent
Jan 27 2020Joint appendix filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jan 27 2020Brief of petitioners Donald J. Trump, et al. filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 29 2020Application (19A862) to file a consolidated respondents' brief on the merits in excess of the word limit, submitted to The Chief Justice. VIDED
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jan 29 2020Brief amicus curiae of Foundation for Moral Law filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jan 31 2020SET FOR ARGUMENT on Tuesday, March 31, 2020. VIDED.
Jan 31 2020Brief amicus curiae of W. Burlette Carter filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 03 2020Brief amicus curiae of United States filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word Count
Feb 03 2020Brief amicus curiae of Eagle Forum Education & Legal Defense Fund filed. VIDED. (Also in 19-635)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 03 2020Brief amicus curiae of Christian Family Coalition (CFC) Florida, Inc. filed. VIDED. (Also in 19-635)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 03 2020Amicus brief of Professor Victor Williams not accepted for filing. (February 12, 2020 - Corrected brief to be submitted.)
Feb 03 2020Brief amicus curiae of Professor Victor Williams filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 04 2020Application (19A862) to file a consolidated respondents' brief on the merits in excess of the word limit is granted by The Chief Justice provided that the brief does not exceed 17,000 words. VIDED.
Feb 05 2020Letter of respondent Mazars USA LLP notifying the Clerk that it does not intend to participate in these cases filed. VIDED. (Also in 19-635)
Main Document
Feb 19 2020CIRCULATED
Feb 19 2020Record requested from the U.S.C.A. District of Columbia Circuit.
Feb 21 2020The record of the USCA District of Columbia Circuit is available on PACER.
Feb 26 2020Brief of respondents Committees of the U.S. House of Representatives filed. (Distributed). VIDED.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 02 2020Letter of respondent Capital One Financial Corporation notifying the Clerk that it does not intend to participate in these cases filed (in 19-760) filed.
Main Document
Mar 03 2020Brief amicus curiae of Public Citizen filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 03 2020Brief amici curiae of Boston University Law Professors Sean J. Kealy and James J. Wheaton filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 04 2020Brief amicus curiae of Constitutional Accountability Center filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 04 2020Brief amici curiae of Former Federal Ethics Officials filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 04 2020Brief amici curiae of Former National Security Officials filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 04 2020Brief amici curiae of Former Senior Department of Justice Officials filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 04 2020Brief amici curiae of American Civil Liberties Union and ACLU of the District of Columbia filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 04 2020Brief amici curiae of Congressional Scholars filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 04 2020Brief amici curiae of Bipartisan Former Members of Congress filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 04 2020Brief amici curiae of Former House General Counsels and Former Congressional Staff filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 04 2020Brief amici curiae of The Lugar Center and the Levin Center at Wayne Law filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 04 2020Brief amici curiae of Seperation-of-Powers Law Professors filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 04 2020Brief amici curiae of The Niskanen Center, Republican Women for Progress, Bill Weld, et al. filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 04 2020Brief amici curiae of Center for Media and Democracy and Citizens for Responsibility and Ethics in Washington filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 04 2020Brief amici curiae of Financial Investigation and Money Laundering Experts filed (in 19-760). (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 04 2020Motion of the Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument filed. VIDED.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Mar 16 2020ORAL ARGUMENT POSTPONED. VIDED.
Mar 23 2020Motion of the Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument GRANTED. VIDED.
Mar 27 2020Reply of petitioners Donald J. Trump, et al. filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 13 2020Argument to be rescheduled for May 2020. VIDED.
Apr 15 2020RESCHEDULED FOR ARGUMENT on Tuesday, May 12, 2020. VIDED.
Apr 27 2020The parties and the Solicitor General are directed to file supplemental letter briefs addressing whether the political question doctrine or related justiciability principles bear on the Court's adjudication of these cases. The briefs, not to exceed 15 pages, are to be filed simultaneously with the Clerk and served upon opposing counsel on or before 2 p.m., Friday, May 8, 2020. VIDED.
May 08 2020Supplemental letter brief of petitioners Donald J. Trump, et al. filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Main Document
May 08 2020Supplemental letter brief of respondents Committees of the U.S. House of Representatives filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Main Document
May 08 2020Supplemental letter brief of the United States filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Main Document
May 12 2020Argued. For petitioners: Patrick Strawbridge, Boston, Mass.; and Jeffrey B. Wall, Principal Deputy Solicitor General, Department of Justice, Washington, D. C. (for United States, as amicus curiae.) For Committees of the U.S. House of Representatives respondents: Douglas N. Letter, General Counsel, United States House of Representatives, Washington, D. C. VIDED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
William Spencer Consovoy
    Counsel of Record
Consovoy McCarthy PLLC
1600 Wilson Boulevard
Suite 700
Arlington, VA 22209

will@consovoymccarthy.com
(703) 243-9423
Party name: Donald J. Trump, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Jerry D. Bernstein
    Counsel of Record
Blank Rome LLP
1271 Avenue of the Americas
New York, NY 10020

jbernstein@blankrome.com
212-885-5511
Party name: Mazars USA, LLP
Douglas Neal Letter
    Counsel of Record
Office of General Counsel, U.S. House of Representatives
219 Cannon House Office Building
Washington, DC 20515

douglas.letter@mail.house.gov
2022259700
Party name: Committee on Oversight and Reform of the U.S. House of Representatives
James Alwin Murphy
    Counsel of Record
Murphy & McGonigle, P.C.
1185 Avenue of the Americas
Floor 21
New York, NY 23219

jmurphy@mmlawus.com
(212) 880-3968
Party name: Capital One Financial Corporation
Pratik Arvind Shah
    Counsel of Record
Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld, LLP
2001 K Street N.W.
Washington, DC 20006

pshah@akingump.com
202-887-4210
Party name: Deutsche Bank AG
Other
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Willieta Burlette Carter
    Counsel of Record
George Washington Univ. (Emerita Prof.)
2000 H. St., N.W.
Washington, DC 20052

bcarter@law.gwu.edu
2029945155
Party name: W. Burlette Carter
Daniel Patrick Chiplock
    Counsel of Record
Lieff Cabraser Heimann & Bernstein, LLP
250 Hudson Street
New York, NY 10013

DCHIPLOCK@lchb.com
(212) 355-9500
Party name: Financial Investigation and Money Laundering Experts
Matthew James Clark
    Counsel of Record
Foundation for Moral Law
1 Dexter Avenue
Montgomery, AL 36104

matt@morallaw.org
334-262-1245
Party name: Foundation for Moral Law
John Arak Freedman
    Counsel of Record
Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer LLP
601 Massachusetts Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20001

John.Freedman@arnoldporter.com
202-942-5316
Party name: Former House General Counsels and Former Congressional Staff
Andrew J. Goodman
    Counsel of Record
Foster Garvey P.C.
100 Wall Street, 20th Floor
New York, NY 10005

andrew.goodman@foster.com
(212) 431-8700
Party name: Center for Media and Democracy and Citizens for Responsibility and Ethics in Washington
Brianne Jenna Gorod
    Counsel of Record
Constitutional Accountability Center
1200 18th Street, NW
Suite 501
Washington, DC 20036

brianne@theusconstitution.org
202 296 6889
Party name: Constitutional Accountability Center
Dennis Grossman
    Counsel of Record
6701 Sunset Drive, Suite 104
Miami, FL 33143

dagrossmanlaw@aol.com
5164666690
Party name: Christian Family Coalition (CFC) Florida, Inc.
Lawrence J. Joseph
    Counsel of Record
Law Office of Lawrence J. Joseph
1250 Connecticut Avenue, NW
Suite 700-1A
Washington, DC 20036

ljoseph@larryjoseph.com
2023559452
Party name: Eagle Forum Education & Legal Defense Fund
Sean Joseph Kealy
    Counsel of Record
Boston University School of Law
765 Commonwealth Avenue
Boston, MA 02215

skealy@bu.edu
6173538373
Party name: Boston University Law Professors Sean J. Kealy and James J. Wheaton
Rakesh Nageswar Kilaru
    Counsel of Record
Wilkinson Walsh LLP
2001 M Street NW
10th Floor
Washington, DC 20036

rkilaru@wilkinsonwalsh.com
2028474046
Party name: Former Senior Department of Justice Officials
Harold Hongju Koh
    Counsel of Record
Peter Gruber Rule of Law Clinic
Yale Law School
127 Wall Street
New Haven, CT 06520-8215

harold.koh@ylsclinics.org
2034641801
Party name: Former National Security Officials
Gregory M. Lipper
    Counsel of Record
Clinton & Peed
777 6th Street NW
11th Floor
Washington, DC 20001

glipper@clintonpeed.com
(202) 996-0919
Party name: Congressional Scholars
Andre Michel Mura
    Counsel of Record
Gibbs Law Group LLP
505 14th Street
Suite 1110
Oakland, CA 94612

amm@classlawgroup.com
5103509717
Party name: Bipartisan Former Members of Congress
William Bullock Pittard
    Counsel of Record
KaiserDillon PLLC
1099 14th Street NW
8th Floor West
Washington, DC 20005

wpittard@kaiserdillon.com
2026402850
Party name: The Lugar Center and the Levin Center at Wayne Law
Dwayne Dason Sam
    Counsel of Record
Pierce Bainbridge Beck Price & Hecht LLP
601 Pennsylvania Ave., NW
Suite 700S
Washington, DC 20004

dsam@piercebainbridge.com
2028438342
Party name: Former Federal Ethics Officials
Zachary D. Tripp
    Counsel of Record
Weil, Gothsal & Manges LLP
2001 M Street NW
Washington, DC 20036

zack.tripp@weil.com
202-682-7000
Party name: Seperation-of-Powers Law Professors
Donald B. Verrilli Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Munger, Tolles & Olson LLP
1155 F Streeet NW
7th Floor
Washington, DC 20004

donald.verrilli@mto.com
202-220-1101
Party name: American Civil Liberties Union and ACLU of the District of Columbia
Victor Keith Williams
    Counsel of Record
Law Professors for Trump
2200 Wilson Boulevard
Arlington, VA 22201

victorkeithwilliams@yahoo.com
571-309-8249
Party name: Professor Victor Williams
Gregory Edwin Wolff
    Counsel of Record
California Appellate Law Group LLP
96 Jessie Street
San Francisco, CA 94105

greg.wolff@calapplaw.com
4156496700
Party name: The Niskanen Center, Republican Women for Progress, Bill Weld, et al.
Allison M. Zieve
    Counsel of Record
Public Citizen Litigation Group
1600 20th Street NW
Washington, DC 20009

azieve@citizen.org
202-588-1000
Party name: Public Citizen