No. 19-710
Title:Connecticut Fine Wine and Spirits, LLC, dba Total Wine & More, Petitioner
v.
Michelle H. Seagull, Commissioner, Connecticut Department of Consumer Protection, et al.
Docketed:December 4, 2019
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-2003)
   Decision Date:July 29, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:September 6, 2019
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 04 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due January 3, 2020)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 11 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from January 3, 2020 to March 3, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Dec 13 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including March 3, 2020, for all respondents.
Dec 13 2019Motion of intervenor respondents to extend the time to file a response from January 3, 2020 to March 3, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Dec 17 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including March 3, 2020, for all respondents.
Dec 24 2019Blanket Consent filed by Respondents, Commissioner Michelle H. Seagull, et al.
Blanket Consent
Jan 03 2020Brief amicus curiae of Southern Glazer's Wine and Spirits, LLC filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 03 2020Brief of respondents Commissioner Michelle H. Seagull, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 03 2020Brief of Langer, Robert Mark Wine & Spirits Wholesalers of Connecticut, Inc. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentOtherCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 16 2020Reply of petitioners Connecticut Fine Wine and Spirits, LLC, dba Total Wine & More filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 18 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/3/2020.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Carter G. Phillips
    Counsel of Record
Sidley Austin LLP
1501 K Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20005

cphillips@sidley.com
+1 202 736 8270
Party name: Connecticut Fine Wine and Spirits, LLC, dba Total Wine & More
Attorneys for Respondents
Clare Elmendorf Kindall
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General
165 Capitol Avenue
Hartford, CT 06106

Clare.Kindall@ct.gov
860-808-5261
Party name: Commissioner Michelle H. Seagull, et al.
Other
Robert Mark Langer
    Counsel of Record
WIggin and Dana LLP
20 Church Street
Hartford, CT 06103

rlanger@wiggin.com
860-297-3724
Party name: Wine & Spirits Wholesalers of Connecticut, Inc.
Jeremy Charles Marwell
    Counsel of Record
Vinson & Elkins LLP
2200 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW, Suite 500W
Washington, DC 20037

jmarwell@velaw.com
202-639-6500
Party name: Southern Glazer's Wine and Spirits, LLC