No. 19-71
Title:FNU Tanzin, et al., Petitioners
v.
Muhammed Tanvir, et al.
Docketed:July 12, 2019
Linked with 18A1135
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-1176)
   Decision Date:June 25, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:February 14, 2019
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
May 03 2019Application (18A1135) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from May 15, 2019 to June 14, 2019, submitted to Justice Ginsburg.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
May 08 2019Application (18A1135) granted by Justice Ginsburg extending the time to file until June 14, 2019.
Jun 03 2019Application (18A1135) to extend further the time from June 14, 2019 to July 14, 2019, submitted to Justice Ginsburg.
Written RequestProof of Service
Jun 04 2019Application (18A1135) granted by Justice Ginsburg extending the time to file until July 14, 2019.
Jul 12 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due August 12, 2019)
PetitionProof of Service
Jul 25 2019Motion of Muhammad Tanvir, et al. for an extension of time not accepted for filing. (July 26, 2019 -- Corrected version to be submitted)
Jul 29 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from August 12, 2019 to October 11, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Aug 02 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including October 11, 2019.
Oct 11 2019Brief of respondents Muhammad Tanvir, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 30 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/15/2019.
Oct 30 2019Reply of petitioners FNU Tanzin, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Certificate of Word CountMain Document
Nov 18 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/22/2019.
Nov 22 2019Petition GRANTED.
Dec 18 2019Motion to dispense with printing the joint appendix filed by petitioners FNU Tanzin, et al.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Jan 06 2020Brief of petitioners FNU Tanzin, et al. filed.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Jan 13 2020Motion to dispense with printing the joint appendix filed by petitioners GRANTED.
Jan 13 2020Brief amici curiae of American Atheists, Center for Inquiry, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 13 2020Brief amici curiae of Freedom From Religion Foundation, et al. in support of neither party filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 28 2020Blanket Consent filed by Respondents, Muhammad Tanvir, et al.
Blanket Consent
Jan 31 2020SET FOR ARGUMENT on Tuesday, March 24, 2020.
Feb 05 2020Brief of respondents Muhammad Tanvir, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 12 2020Brief amicus curiae of The Sikh Coalition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 12 2020Brief amicus curiae of Jeffrey D. Kahn filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 12 2020Brief amicus curiae of American-Arab Anti-Discrimination Committee filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 12 2020Brief amicus curiae of The Rutherford Institute filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 12 2020Brief amici curiae of Statutory Interpretation Scholars filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 12 2020Brief amicus curiae of The Becket Fund for Religious Liberty filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 12 2020Brief amici curiae of Religious and Civil-Rights Organizations filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 12 2020Brief amicus curiae of General Conference of Seventh-day Adventists filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 12 2020Brief amicus curiae of Muslim Advocates filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 12 2020Brief amicus curiae of Institute for Justice filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 12 2020Brief amici curiae of 67 Religious Organizations filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 12 2020Brief amici curiae of Fourteen Religious-Liberty Scholars, et al. filed.
Proof of ServiceMain DocumentCertificate of Word Count
Feb 12 2020Brief amici curiae of Religious Organizations, Public Speakers and Scholars filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 19 2020Record requested from the U.S.C.A. 2nd Circuit.
Feb 19 2020CIRCULATED
Feb 20 2020Record from the USCA 2nd Circuit received electronically.
Mar 06 2020Reply of petitioners FNU Tanzin, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of Service
Mar 16 2020ORAL ARGUMENT POSTPONED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: FNU Tanzin, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Ramzi Kassem
    Counsel of Record
City University of New York School of Law
Main Street Legal Services, Inc.
2 Court Square
Long Island City, NY 11101

ramzi.kassem@law.cuny.edu
7183404558
Party name: Muhammad Tanvir, et al.
Other
Anna Aleksandrovna Bidwell
    Counsel of Record
Institute for Justice
816 Congress Avenue
Suite 960
Austin, TX 78701

abidwell@ij.org
5124805936
Party name: Institute for Justice
Matthew William Callahan
    Counsel of Record
Muslim Advocates
P.O. Box 34440
Washington, DC 20043

matthew@muslimadvocates.org
202-897-1892
Party name: Muslim Advocates
Richard Brian Katskee
    Counsel of Record
Americans United for Separation of Church and State
1310 L Street NW, Suite 200
Washington, DC 20005

katskee@au.org
202-466-3234
Party name: Religious and Civil-Rights Organizations
Harold Douglas Laycock
    Counsel of Record
Michigan State University College of Law
648 N. Shaw Lane
East Lansing, MI 48824

DLAYCOCK@VIRGINIA.EDU
512-656-1789
Party name: Fourteen Religious-Liberty Scholars et al.
Michael J. Lockerby
    Counsel of Record
Foley & Lardner LLP
3000 K Street, N.W., Suite 600
Washington Harbour
Washington, DC 20007

mlockerby@foley.com
202-945-6079
Party name: The Rutherford Institute
Adeel Abdullah Mangi
    Counsel of Record
Patterson Belknap Webb & Tyler LLP
1133 Avenue of the Americas
New York, NY 10036

aamangi@pbwt.com
(212) 36-2000
Party name: 67 RELIGIOUS ORGANIZATIONS
Alan Evan Schoenfeld
    Counsel of Record
Wilmer, Cutler, Pickering, Hale and Dorr, LLP
7 World Trade Center, 250 World Trade Center
New York, NY 10007

alan.schoenfeld@wilmerhale.com
(212) 937-7518
Party name: Statutory Interpretation Scholars
Kelly J. Shackelford
    Counsel of Record
First Liberty Institute
2001 W Piano Pkwy
Suite 1600
Plano, TX 75075

kshackelford@firstliberty.org
972-941-4444
Party name: Religious Organizations, Public Speakers and Scholars
James A. Sonne
    Counsel of Record
Religious Liberty Clinic, Stanford Law School
559 Nathan Abbott Way
Stanford, CA 94305-8610

jsonne@law.stanford.edu
650-723-1422
Party name: The Sikh Coalition
Gordon Dwyer Todd
    Counsel of Record
Sidley Austin LLP
1501 K Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20005

gtodd@sidley.com
(202) 736-8000
Party name: General Conference of Seventh-day Adventists
Andrew Timothy Tutt
    Counsel of Record
Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer
601 Massachusetts Ave. NW
Washington, DC 20001

andrew.tutt@arnoldporter.com
9196995905
Party name: Jeffrey D. Kahn
Lori Halstead Windham
    Counsel of Record
The Becket Fund for Religious Liberty
1200 New Hampshire Ave., NW
Suite 700
Washington, DC 20036

lwindham@becketlaw.org
202-955-0095
Party name: The Becket Fund for Religious Liberty
Christopher J. Wright
    Counsel of Record
Harris, Wiltshire & Grannis LLP
1919 M Street, NW, Fl. 8
Washington, DC 20036

cwright@hwglaw.com
2023331325
Party name: American-Arab Anti-Discrimination Committee
Geoffrey Thomas Blackwell
    Counsel of Record
American Atheists, Inc.
718 7th St. NW
Washington, DC 20001

gblackwell@atheists.org
9086038787
Party name: American Atheists, Center for Inquiry, Ex-Muslims of North America, and Black Nonbelievers
Patrick C Elliott
    Counsel of Record
Freedom From Religion Foundation
10 N. Henry St.
Madison, WI 53701

pelliott@ffrf.org
6082568900
Party name: Freedom From Religion Foundation and American Humanist Association