No. 19-7007 | |
Title: | Bryshun Genard Furlow, Petitioner v. United States |
Docketed: | December 19, 2019 |
Linked with 19A399 | |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit |
Case Numbers: | (18-4531) |
Decision Date: | June 27, 2019 |
Rehearing Denied: | August 2, 2019 |
Date | Proceedings and Orders |
Oct 04 2019 | Application (19A399) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from October 31, 2019 to December 17, 2019, submitted to The Chief Justice. |
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service | |
Oct 10 2019 | Application (19A399) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until December 17, 2019. |
Dec 13 2019 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due January 21, 2020) |
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixProof of Service | |
Dec 30 2019 | Waiver of right of respondent United States of America to respond filed. |
Main Document | |
Jan 08 2020 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/24/2020. |
Jan 16 2020 | Response Requested. (Due February 18, 2020) |
Feb 12 2020 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from February 18, 2020 to March 19, 2020, submitted to The Clerk. |
Main Document | |
Feb 13 2020 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including March 19, 2020. |
Mar 11 2020 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 19, 2020 to April 20, 2020, submitted to The Clerk. |
Main Document | |
Mar 12 2020 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including April 20, 2020. |
Apr 10 2020 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 20, 2020 to April 24, 2020, submitted to The Clerk. |
Main Document | |
Apr 13 2020 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including April 24, 2020. |
Apr 24 2020 | Brief of respondent United States of America in opposition filed. |
Main DocumentProof of Service | |
Apr 30 2020 | Reply of petitioner Bryshun Genard Furlow filed. |
Main DocumentProof of Service | |
May 12 2020 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/28/2020. |
Jun 01 2020 | Motion to proceed in forma pauperis and petition for a writ of certiorari GRANTED. Judgment VACATED and case REMANDED for further consideration in light of Rehaif v. United States, 588 U. S. ___ (2019). |
Jul 06 2020 | JUDGMENT ISSUED. |
NAME | ADDRESS | PHONE |
Attorneys for Petitioner | ||
Kimberly H. Albro Counsel of Record | Federal Public Defender's Office 1901 Assembly Street, Suite 200 Columbia, SC 29201 Kimberly_Albro@fd.org | 803-765-5088 |
Party name: Bryshun Genard Furlow | ||
Attorneys for Respondent | ||
Noel J. Francisco Counsel of Record | Solicitor General United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW Washington, DC 20530-0001 SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov | 202-514-2217 |
Party name: United States of America |