No. 19-7
Title:Seila Law LLC, Petitioner
v.
Consumer Financial Protection Bureau
Docketed:June 28, 2019
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-56324)
   Decision Date:May 6, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 28 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due July 29, 2019)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 12 2019Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Seila Law LLC.
Blanket Consent
Jul 24 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from July 29, 2019 to August 28, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jul 25 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including August 28, 2019.
Jul 29 2019Brief amici curiae of Separation of Powers Scholars filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 29 2019Brief amici curiae of States of Texas, et al. filed. (Aug. 6, 2019)(Corrected version submitted)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jul 29 2019Brief amicus curiae of Cato Institute filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 29 2019Brief amicus curiae of The Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 29 2019Brief amici curiae of Southeastern Legal Foundation, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 29 2019Brief amicus curiae of Pacific Legal Foundation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 29 2019Brief amicus curiae of Landmark Legal Foundation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 15 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from August 28, 2019 to September 18, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Aug 16 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including September 18, 2019.
Sep 17 2019Brief of respondent Consumer Financial Protection Bureau filed.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Sep 17 2019Waiver of the 14-day waiting period under Rule 15.5 filed by petitioner.
Main Document
Sep 18 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/11/2019.
Oct 04 2019Motion of United States House of Representatives for leave to file a brief as amicus curiae out of time filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 04 2019Reply of petitioner Seila Law LLC filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 10 2019Motion of Alan B. Morrison for leave to file a brief as amicus curiae out of time filed.
Proof of ServiceCertificate of Word CountMain Document
Oct 15 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/18/2019.
Oct 18 2019Motion of United States House of Representatives for leave to file a brief as amicus curiae out of time GRANTED.
Oct 18 2019Motion of Alan B. Morrison for leave to file a brief as amicus curiae out of time GRANTED.
Oct 18 2019Petition GRANTED. In addition to the question presented by the petition, the parties are directed to brief and argue the following question: If the Consumer Financial Protection Bureau is found unconstitutional on the basis of the separation of powers, can 12 U.S.C. §5491(c)(3) be severed from the Dodd-Frank Act?.
Oct 22 2019Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Seila Law LLC.
Blanket Consent
Oct 23 2019Paul D. Clement, Esquire, of Washington, D.C., is invited to brief and argue this case, as amicus curiae, in support of the judgment below on the question presented by the petition.
Oct 28 2019Blanket Consent filed by Respondent, Consumer Financial Protection Bureau
Blanket Consent
Oct 28 2019Joint motion for an extension of time to file the briefs on the merits filed.
Main Document
Oct 30 2019Amicus curiae briefs, on both or either question being briefed in this case, shall be filed within 7 days after the party supported files its brief on the question presented by the petition.
Oct 30 2019Joint motion to extend the time to file the briefs on the merits granted. The time to file the joint appendix, petitioner's brief on the merits, and respondent's brief on the merits is extended to and including December 9, 2019. The time to file the brief on the merits of Court-appointed amicus curiae in support of the judgment below on the question presented by the petition is extended to and including January 15, 2020.
Nov 14 2019Motion to dispense with printing the joint appendix filed by petitioner Seila Law LLC.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Nov 26 2019SET FOR ARGUMENT on Tuesday, March 3, 2020.
Dec 09 2019Motion to dispense with printing the joint appendix filed by petitioner GRANTED.
Dec 09 2019Brief of petitioner Seila Law LLC filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 09 2019Brief of respondent Consumer Financial Protection Bureau filed.
Certificate of Word CountMain Document
Dec 13 2019Brief amicus curiae of Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 13 2019Brief amicus curiae of Alan B. Morrison in support of neither party filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 13 2019Brief amicus curiae of Pacific Legal Foundation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 16 2019Brief amici curiae of Southeastern Legal Foundation and National Federation of Independent Business Small Business Legal Center filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 16 2019Brief amici curiae of Patrick J. Collins, Marcus J. Liotta, and William M. Hitchcock filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 16 2019Brief amicus curiae of Harpeth Financial Services, LLC filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 16 2019Brief amici curiae of Nationwide Biweekly Administration, Inc., et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 16 2019Brief amici curiae of Twenty-Seven Members of the U.S. House of Representatives filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 16 2019Brief amicus curiae of Washington Legal Foundation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 16 2019Brief amicus curiae of The Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 16 2019Brief amici curiae of State National Bank of Big Spring, The Competitive Enterprise Institute, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 16 2019Brief amicus curiae of Center for the Rule of Law filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 16 2019Brief amici curiae of States of Texas, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Dec 16 2019Brief amici curiae of Mortgage Bankers Association, et al. in support of neither party filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 16 2019Brief amici curiae of RD Legal Funding Partners, LP, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 16 2019Brief amicus curiae of New Civil Liberties Alliance filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 16 2019Brief amici curiae of Separation of Powers Scholars filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 16 2019Brief amicus curiae of Landmark Legal Foundation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 16 2019Brief amicus curiae of Credit Union National Association, Inc. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 16 2019Brief amicus curiae of Consumer Bankers Association in support of neither party filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 16 2019Brief amici curiae of The Cato Institute, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 16 2019Brief amici curiae of U.S. Senators Mike Lee, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 16 2019Brief amicus curiae of The Buckeye Institute filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jan 09 2020Record requested from the U.S.C.A. 9th Circuit.
Jan 09 2020The record of the USCA 9th Circuit is available on PACER.
Jan 15 2020Brief amicus curiae of Court-appointed amicus curiae in support of the judgment below on the question presented by the petition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 21 2020CIRCULATED
Jan 21 2020Motion for enlargement of time for oral argument and for divided argument filed by petitioner Seila Law LLC.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jan 21 2020Brief amici curiae of Public Citizen, Inc., et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 21 2020Motion of United States House of Representatives for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jan 22 2020Brief amici curiae of Current and Former Members of Congress filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 22 2020Brief amici curiae of Harold H. Bruff, et al. filed. (Distributed)
OtherMain DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 22 2020Brief amici curiae of Self-Help Credit Union, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 22 2020Brief amici curiae of Project on Government Oversight and Morton Rosenberg filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 22 2020Brief amici curiae of Professors Martin S. Lederman, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Proof of ServiceCertificate of Word CountMain Document
Jan 22 2020Brief amici curiae of Rachel E. Barkow, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jan 22 2020Brief amicus curiae of Main Street Alliance filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 22 2020Brief amici curiae of National Consumer Law Center, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 22 2020Brief amici curiae of Financial Regulation Scholars filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 22 2020Brief amici curiae of U.S. Senators Sheldon Whitehouse, Richard Blumenthal, and Mazie Hirono filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 22 2020Brief amicus curiae of United States House of Representatives filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 22 2020Brief amicus curiae of Professor John Harrison filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 22 2020Brief amici curiae of State of New York, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 14 2020Motion of United States House of Representatives for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument GRANTED.
Feb 14 2020Motion for enlargement of time for oral argument and for divided argument GRANTED, and the time is divided as follows: 20 minutes for the petitioner, 20 minutes for the Solicitor General, 20 minutes for the Court-appointed amicus curiae, and 10 minutes for the United States House of Representatives.
Feb 14 2020Reply of respondent Consumer Financial Protection Bureau filed. (Distributed)
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Feb 14 2020Reply of petitioner Seila Law LLC filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 03 2020Argued. For petitioner: Kannon K. Shanmugam, Washington, D. C. For respondent supporting vacatur: Noel J. Francisco, Solicitor General, Department of Justice, Washington, D. C. For Court-appointed amicus curiae in support of the judgment below: Paul D. Clement, Washington, D. C. For United States House of Representatives as amicus curiae: Douglas N. Letter, General Counsel, Washington, D. C.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Kannon K. Shanmugam
    Counsel of Record
Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison LLP
2001 K Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20006

kshanmugam@paulweiss.com
(202) 223-7300
Party name: Seila Law LLC
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Consumer Financial Protection Bureau
Other
Corbin Knight Barthold
    Counsel of Record
Washington Legal Foundation
2009 Massachusetts Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20036

cbarthold@wlf.org
2025880302
Party name: Washington Legal Foundation
Michael A. Carvin
    Counsel of Record
Jones Day
51 Louisiana Ave., N.W.
Washington, DC 20001

macarvin@jonesday.com
(202) 879-7643
Party name: Twenty-Seven Members of the U.S. House of Representatives
Joseph Carl Cecere
    Counsel of Record
Cecere, PC
6035 McCommas Blvd.
Dallas, TX 75206

ccecere@cecerepc.com
469-600-9455
Party name: Project on Government Oversight and Morton Rosenberg
Paul D. Clement
    Counsel of Record
Kirkland & Ellis LLP
1301 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20004

paul.clement@kirkland.com
2023895000
Party name: Court-appointed amicus curiae in support of the judgment below on the question presented by the petition
William Spencer Consovoy
    Counsel of Record
Consovoy McCarthy PLLC
1600 Wilson Boulevard
Suite 700
Arlington, VA 22209

will@consovoymccarthy.com
(703) 243-9423
Party name: The Buckeye Institute
Charles Justin Cooper
    Counsel of Record
Cooper & Kirk, PLLC
1523 New Hampshire Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC 20036

ccooper@cooperkirk.com
202-220-9600
Party name: Patrick J. Collins, Marcus J. Liotta, and William M. Hitchcock
Oliver James Dunford
    Counsel of Record
Pacific Legal Foundation
930 G Street
Sacramento, CA 95814

odunford@pacificlegal.org
9164197111
Party name: Pacific Legal Foundation
John C. Eastman
    Counsel of Record
Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence
c/o Fowler School of Law Chapman University
One University Drive
Orange, CA 92866

jeastman@chapman.edu
877-855-3330
Party name: Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence
Julian Richard Ellis Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Brownstein Hyatt Farber Schreck, LLP
410 17th Street, Suite 2200
Denver, CO 80202

jellis@bhfs.com
303-223-1142
Party name: Credit Union National Association, Inc.
Steven Eliott Fineman
    Counsel of Record
Lieff Cabraser Heimann & Bernstein, LLP
250 Hudson Street
8th Floor
New York, NY 10013

sfineman@lchb.com
(212) 355-9500
Party name: Main Street Alliance
Matthew Conrad Forys
    Counsel of Record
Landmark Legal Foundation
19415 Deerfield Avenue, Suite 312
Leesburg, VA 20176

matt@landmarklegal.org
703-554-6100
Party name: Landmark Legal Foundation
Jonathan Saul Franklin
    Counsel of Record
Norton Rose Fulbright US LLP
799 9th Street NW
Suite 1000
Washington, DC 20001

jonathan.franklin@nortonrosefulbright.com
2026620466
Party name: Consumer Bankers Association
Albert Quoc Giang
    Counsel of Record
Boies Schiller Flexner LLP
725 S. Figueroa St
31st Floor
Los Angeles, CA 90017

agiang@bsfllp.com
2136299040
Party name: RD Legal Funding Partners, LP, RD Legal Finance, LLC, RD Legal Funding, LLC, and Roni Dersovitz
Brianne Jenna Gorod
    Counsel of Record
Constitutional Accountability Center
1200 18th Street, NW
Suite 501
Washington, DC 20036

brianne@theusconstitution.org
202 296 6889
Party name: Current and Former Members of Congress
Andrew Michael Grossman
    Counsel of Record
Baker & Hostetler LLP
1050 Connecticut Avenue, N.W.
Suite 1100
Washington, DC 20036

agrossman@bakerlaw.com
2028611697
Party name: Harpeth Financial Services, LLC
Deepak Gupta
    Counsel of Record
Gupta Wessler PLLC
1900 L Street, NW
Suite 312
Washington, DC 20036

deepak@guptawessler.com
(202) 888-1741
Party name: Financial Regulation Scholars
John Harrison
    Counsel of Record
580 Massie Road
Charlottesville, VA 22903

jh8m@virginia.edu
4349243093
Party name: Professor John Harrison
Kyle Douglas Hawkins
    Counsel of Record
Texas Attorney General's Office
P.O. Box 12548 (MC 059)
Austin, TX 78711-2548

kyle.hawkins@oag.texas.gov
5129361700
Party name: STATES OF TEXAS, ARKANSAS, GEORGIA, INDIANA, KANSAS, LOUISIANA, NEBRASKA, OKLAHOMA, SOUTH CAROLINA, TENNESSEE, UTAH, AND WEST VIGINIA
Kimberly Stewart HermannSoutheastern Legal Foundation
560 W. Crossville Rd.
Suite 104
Roswell, GA 30075-7509

khermann@southeasternlegal.org
770-977-2131
Party name: Southeastern Legal Foundation and National Federation of Independent Business Small Business Legal Center
Richard Peter HutchisonLandmark Legal Foundation
3100 Broadway
Suite 1200
Kansas City, MO 64111

pete.hutch@landmarklegal.org
8169315559
Party name: Landmark Legal Foundation
Gregory Frederick Jacob
    Counsel of Record
O'Melveny & Myers LLP
1625 Eye Street, NW
Washington, DC 20006

gjacob@omm.com
(202) 383-5300
Party name: State National Bank of Big Spring, The Competitive Enterprise Institute, and The 60 Plus Association in Support of Petitioner
Scott A. Keller
    Counsel of Record
Baker Botts LLP
1299 Pennsylvania Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20004

scott.keller@bakerbotts.com
2026397837
Party name: Southeastern Legal Foundation and National Federation of Independent Business Small Business Legal Center
Scott A. KellerBaker Botts LLP
1299 Pennsylvania Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20004

scott.keller@bakerbotts.com
2026397700
Party name: Cato Institute
Benjamin Barnet Klubes
    Counsel of Record
Buckley LLP
2001 M St. NW
Suite 500
Washington, DC 20036

bklubes@buckleyfirm.com
2023498000
Party name: Mortgage Bankers Association, National Association of Home Builders, and National Association of Realtors
Martin Seth Lederman
    Counsel of Record
600 New Jersey Avenue NW
Washington, DC 20001

martin.lederman@law.georgetown.edu
3012216618
Party name: PROFESSORS MARTIN S. LEDERMAN AND DAVID C. VLADECK
Douglas Neal Letter
    Counsel of Record
Office of General Counsel, United States House of Representatives
219 Cannon House Office Building
Washington, DC 20515

douglas.letter@mail.house.gov
202-225-9700
Party name: United States House of Representatives
Jonathan F. Mitchell
    Counsel of Record
Mitchell Law PLLC
111 Congress Avenue
Suite 400
Austin, TX 78701

jonathan@mitchell.law
(512) 686-3940
Party name: New Civil Liberties Alliance
Alan B. Morrison
    Counsel of Record
George Washington Law School
2000 H Street NW
Washington, DC 20052

abmorrison@law.gwu.edu
2029947120
Party name: Alan B. Morrison
Scott Lawrence Nelson
    Counsel of Record
Public Citizen Litigation Group
1600 20th Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20009

snelson@citizen.org
202-588-1000
Party name: Public Citizen, Inc., et al.
Latif Mohamed Nurani
    Counsel of Record
Spiegel & McDiarmid LLP
1875 Eye Street NW
Suite 700
Washington, DC 20006

latif.nurani@spiegelmcd.com
2028794075
Party name: Harold H. Bruff, Jessica Bulman-Pozen, Jerry L. Mashaw, Gillian Metzger, Anne Joseph O’Connell, Peter M. Shane, Peter L. Strauss, and Paul R. Verkuil
Theodore B. Olson
    Counsel of Record
Gibson Dunn & Crutcher LLP
1050 Connecticut Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20036

tolson@gibsondunn.com
(202) 955-8668
Party name: Center for the Rule of Law
Amanda Rose Parker
    Counsel of Record
Jones Day
901 Lakeside Ave.
Cleveland, OH 44114

arparker@jonesday.com
(216) 586-7131
Party name: Nationwide Biweekly Administration, Inc., Loan Payment Administration LLC, and Daniel S. Lipsky
Andrew John Pincus
    Counsel of Record
Mayer Brown LLP
1999 K Street, NW
Washington, DC 20006

apincus@mayerbrown.com
202-263-3000
Party name: The Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America
Richard L. Revesz
    Counsel of Record
New York University
School of Law
40 Washington Square South
New York, NY 10012-0000

richard.revesz@nyu.edu
212-998-6185
Party name: Rachel E. Barkow, et al.
Stuart Todd Rossman
    Counsel of Record
7 Winthrop Square
Boston, MA 02110

srossman@nclc.org
617-542-8010
Party name: National Consumer Law Center, et al.
Gene Clayton Schaerr
    Counsel of Record
Schaerr | Jaffe
1717 K Street NW, Suite 900
Washington, DC 20006

gschaerr@schaerr-jaffe.com
202-787-1060
Party name: U.S. Senators Mike Lee, James Lankford, and M. Michael Rounds
Ilya Shapiro
    Counsel of Record
Cato Institute
1000 Massachusetts Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20001

ishapiro@cato.org
2028420200
Party name: The Cato Institute
Daniel S. Sommers
    Counsel of Record
Cohen, Milstein, Hausfeld & Toll, PLLC
1100 New York Avenue, NW
West Tower, Suite 500
Washington, DC 20005

dsommers@cohenmilstein.com
202-408-4609
Party name: Self-Help Credit Union, Hope Credit Union, Hope Enterprise Corporation, National Association of Latino Community Asset Builders, and Inclusiv
Stephen Daily Susman
    Counsel of Record
Susman Godfrey LLP
1301 Avenue of the Americas
32nd Floor
New York, NY 10019-6023

ssusman@susmangodfrey.com
(212) 336-8330
Party name: U.S. Senators Sheldon Whitehouse. Richard Blumenthal, and Mazie Hirono
Barbara Dale Underwood
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
Office of the Attorney General
28 Liberty Street
New York, NY 10005-1400

Barbara.underwood@ag.ny.gov
212-416-8016
Party name: State of New York et al.
Ilan Wurman
    Counsel of Record
Sandra Day O'Connor College of Law, Arizona State University
111 E. Taylor St , MC 9520
Phoenix, AZ 85004

ilan.wurman@gmail.com
480-965-2245
Party name: Separation of Powers Scholars