No. 19-682
Title:Melanie Kelsay, Petitioner
v.
Matt Ernst
Docketed:November 26, 2019
Linked with 19A473
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eighth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-2181)
   Decision Date:August 13, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 30 2019Application (19A473) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from November 11, 2019 to December 11, 2019, submitted to Justice Gorsuch.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceLower Court Orders/Opinions
Oct 30 2019Application (19A473) granted by Justice Gorsuch extending the time to file until December 11, 2019.
Nov 26 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 26, 2019)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 23 2019Brief amicus curiae of Cato Institute filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 23 2019Waiver of right of respondent Matt Ernst to respond filed.
Main Document
Jan 08 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/24/2020.
Jan 13 2020Response Requested. (Due February 12, 2020)
Feb 04 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from February 12, 2020 to March 13, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Feb 04 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including March 13, 2020.
Mar 13 2020Brief of respondent Matt Ernst in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 24 2020Motion of petitioner to delay distribution of the petition for a writ of certiorari under Rule 15.5 from April 1, 2020 to April 28, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Mar 25 2020Motion to delay distribution of the petition for a writ certiorari until April 28, 2020, granted.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
David Michael Shapiro
    Counsel of Record
Roderick & Solange MacArthur Justice Center
375 East Chicago Avenue
Chicago, IL 60611

david.shapiro@law.northwestern.edu
3125030711
Party name: Melanie Kelsay
Attorneys for Respondent
Brandy Rae Johnson
    Counsel of Record
Governmental Law, LLC
8040 Eiger Drive
Suite B
Lincoln, NE 68516

brandy@nrmainc.info
4027429240
Party name: Matt Ernst
Other
Jay Remington Schweikert
    Counsel of Record
The Cato Institute
1000 Massachusetts Ave. NW
Washington, DC 20001

jschweikert@cato.org
2022161461
Party name: Cato Institute