No. 19-679
Title:Amy Corbitt, Petitioner
v.
Michael Vickers
Docketed:November 26, 2019
Linked with 19A309
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-15566)
   Decision Date:July 10, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Sep 16 2019Application (19A309) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from October 8, 2019 to December 6, 2019, submitted to Justice Thomas.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Sep 20 2019Application (19A309) granted by Justice Thomas extending the time to file until December 6, 2019.
Nov 22 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 26, 2019)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 06 2019Waiver of right of respondent Michael Vickers to respond filed.
Main Document
Dec 18 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/10/2020.
Dec 20 2019Brief amici curiae of Cross-Ideological Groups Dedicated to Ensuring Official Accountability, Restoring the Public's Trust in Law Enforcement, and Promoting the Rule of Law filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 08 2020Response Requested. (Due February 7, 2020)
Jan 14 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from February 7, 2020 to March 9, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jan 16 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including March 9, 2020.
Feb 18 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 9, 2020 to April 8, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Feb 19 2020Response to motion from petitioner Amy Corbitt filed.
Main Document
Feb 20 2020Reply in support of motion filed.
Main Document
Feb 24 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including April 8, 2020.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Paul Whitfield Hughes
    Counsel of Record
McDermott Will & Emery
500 North Capitol Street, NW
Washington, DC 20001

PHughes@mwe.com
(202) 756-8981
Party name: Amy Corbitt
Attorneys for Respondent
Richard Keith Strickland
    Counsel of Record
Brown, Readdick,et al.
5 Glynn Avenue
Brunswick, GA 31520

rstrickland@brbcsw.com
9122648544
Party name: Michael Vickers
Other
Jay Remington Schweikert
    Counsel of Record
The Cato Institute
1000 Massachusetts Ave. NW
Washington, DC 20001

jschweikert@cato.org
2022161461
Party name: Cross-Ideological Groups Dedicated to Ensuring Official Accountability, Restoring the Public's Trust in Law Enforcement, and Promoting the Rule of Law