No. 19-678
Title:United States, ex rel. Laurence Schneider, Petitioner
v.
JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association, et al.
Docketed:November 26, 2019
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the District of Columbia Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-7025)
   Decision Date:August 22, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Nov 20 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 26, 2019)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 17 2019Motion of the Solicitor General to extend the time to file a response from December 26, 2019 to January 27, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Dec 17 2019Motion of respondents JPMorgan Chase Bank, et al. to extend the time to file a response from December 26, 2019 to January 27, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Dec 18 2019The motions to extend the time to file responses are granted and the time is extended to and including January 27, 2020, for all respondents.
Jan 16 2020Motion of the Solicitor General to extend the time to file a response from January 27, 2020 to March 4, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jan 17 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including March 4, 2020, for all respondents.
Jan 17 2020Motion of respondents JPMorgan Chase Bank, et al. to extend the time to file a response from January 27, 2020 to March 4, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jan 21 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including March 4, 2020, for all respondents.
Mar 04 2020Brief of respondents JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association; JP Morgan Chase & Co.; Chase Home Finance, LLC in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 04 2020Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Mar 12 2020Reply of petitioners Laurence Schneider,et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 18 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/3/2020.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Roberto Luigi Di Marco
    Counsel of Record
Foster, Walker & Di Marco, P.C.
350 Main Street, 3rd Fl
Malden, MA 02148

rdimarco@fwd-law.com
7813223700
Party name: Laurence Schneider
Attorneys for Respondents
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Mark W. Mosier
    Counsel of Record
Covington & Burling, LLP
One CityCenter 850 Tenth Street, NW
Washington, DC 20001

mmosier@cov.com
202-662-5435
Party name: JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association; JP Morgan Chase & Co.; Chase Home Finance, LLC