No. 19-675
Title:Bank of America Corporation, et al., Petitioners
v.
City of Miami, Florida
Docketed:November 26, 2019
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(14-14543, 14-14544)
   Decision Date:May 3, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:August 26, 2019
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Nov 25 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 26, 2019)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 09 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from December 26, 2019 to January 27, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Dec 12 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including January 27, 2020.
Dec 20 2019Brief amicus curiae of The Cato Institute filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 24 2019Brief amici curiae of American Bankers Association et al. filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 26 2019Brief amici curiae of Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 26 2019Brief amicus curiae of DRI-The Voice of the Defense Bar filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 27 2020Brief of respondent City of Miami, Florida in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 03 2020Suggestion of Mootness filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceOther
Feb 11 2020Reply of petitioners Bank of America Corporation, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Feb 12 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/28/2020.
Feb 13 2020Reply Brief in Support of Suggestion of Mootness of City of Miami, Florida submitted.
Main DocumentOtherProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
William McGinley Jay
    Counsel of Record
Goodwin Procter, LLP
1900 N Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20036

WJay@goodwinlaw.com
2023464190
Party name: Bank of America Corporation, et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Robert S. Peck
    Counsel of Record
Center for Constitutional Litigation, P.C.
455 Massachusetts Avenue, NW
Suite 152
Washington, DC 20001

robert.peck@cclfirm.com
2029442874
Party name: City of Miami, Florida
Other
Daniel Patrick Kearney Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale & Dorr LLP
1875 Pennsylvania Avenue NW
Washington, DC 20815

Daniel.Kearney@wilmerhale.com
202-663-6285
Party name: Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, American Property Casualty Insurance Association, and Business Roundtable
Robert Allen Long Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Covington & Burling, LLP
One CityCenter
850 Tenth St., NW
Washington, DC 20001

rlong@cov.com
202-662-5612
Party name: American Bankers Association et al.
Matthew T. Nelson
    Counsel of Record
Warner Norcross + Judd LLP
1500 Warner Building
150 Ottawa Avenue NW
Grand Rapids, MI 49503

mnelson@wnj.com
(616) 752-2539
Party name: DRI-The Voice of the Defense Bar
Ilya Shapiro
    Counsel of Record
Cato Institute
1000 Massachusetts Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20001

ishapiro@cato.org
2028420200
Party name: The Cato Institute