No. 19-673
Title:Melida Teresa Luna-Garcia, Petitioner
v.
William P. Barr, Attorney General
Docketed:November 26, 2019
Linked with 19A292
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-60847)
   Decision Date:July 23, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Sep 04 2019Application (19A292) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from October 21, 2019 to December 20, 2019, submitted to Justice Alito.
Sep 16 2019Application (19A292) granted by Justice Alito extending the time to file until November 20, 2019.
Nov 20 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 26, 2019)
Nov 20 2019Pursuant to Rule 34.6 and Paragraph 9 of the Guidelines for the Submission of Documents to the Supreme Court's Electronic Filing System, filings in this case should be submitted in paper form only, and should not be submitted through the Court's electronic filing system.
Dec 17 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from December 26, 2019 to January 27, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Dec 18 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including January 27, 2020.
Dec 30 2019Brief amici curiae of Catholic Legal Immigration Network, Inc., et al. filed.
Jan 22 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from January 27, 2020 to February 26, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Jan 23 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including February 26, 2020.
Feb 19 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from February 26, 2020 to March 27, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Feb 20 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including March 27, 2020.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Nadia Halima Dahab
    Counsel of Record
Innovation Law Lab
333 SW Fifth Ave., Ste. 200
Portland, OR 97204

nadia@innovationlawlab.org
971-277-3424
Party name: Melida T. Luna-Garcia
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Barr, William
Other
Roxanna Marie Altholz
    Counsel of Record
International Human Rights Law Clinic (Berkeley Law)
University of California, Berkeley School of Law, 489 Simon Hall
Berkeley, CA 94720-7200

raltholz@law.berkeley.edu
5106438781
Party name: Catholic Legal Immigration Network, Inc.; Justice Action Center; Las Americas Immigrant Action Center